This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:12:39 (UTC).

TEW v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 TEW filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP EXPLORATION PRODUCTION INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-04892

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARSHALL SCOTT TEW

Defendants

BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC

BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOWARD L NATIONS

Attorney at HOWARD L NATIONS PC - HOUSTON TX

3131 Briarpark Drive, Suite 208

Houston, TX 77042-3795

Defendant Attorneys

KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES

Attorney at WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY LLP - WASHINGTON DC

725 12Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR

Attorney at MCDONALD TOOLE WIGGINS PA - ORLANDO FL

111 N Magnolia Ave, Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#3

(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS No.'s 1 and 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 05/31/2019)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-10804. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than November 1, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than December 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 10/2/2019. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER - For purposes of administrative efficiency and judicial economy the Court has established a separate case, In re Deepwater Horizon BELO Cases, Case No. 3:19cv963, which will serve as a master docket for the management of the BELO cases transferred to the Northern District of Florida from the Eastern District of Louisiana. All individual BELO cases will be linked to the master docket. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/25/2019. (djb) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR on behalf of BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC (MCDONALD, FRANCIS) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER - The Court hereby STAYS all Deepwater Horizon BELO cases currently filed and those filed in the future, unless an order lifting the stay is or has been entered in the individual case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/13/2019. (djb) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 06/28/2019)

3 #3

BELO Settlement Agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7673308) filed by Marshall Scott Tew. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Marshall Scott Tew(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 05/29/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 12/4/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #2

Exhibit B

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR on behalf of BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC (MCDONALD, FRANCIS) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER - The Court hereby STAYS all Deepwater Horizon BELO cases currently filed and those filed in the future, unless an order lifting the stay is or has been entered in the individual case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/13/2019. (djb) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER - For purposes of administrative efficiency and judicial economy the Court has established a separate case, In re Deepwater Horizon BELO Cases, Case No. 3:19cv963, which will serve as a master docket for the management of the BELO cases transferred to the Northern District of Florida from the Eastern District of Louisiana. All individual BELO cases will be linked to the master docket. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/25/2019. (djb) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-10804. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 12/4/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than November 1, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than December 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 10/2/2019. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS No.'s 1 and 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7673308) filed by Marshall Scott Tew. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Marshall Scott Tew(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less