This case was last updated from PACER on 10/30/2020 at 07:32:54 (UTC).

Testa v. Saul

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 Testa filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kandis A. Westmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-06138

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kandis A. Westmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Caryn Lee Testa

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Geri Nadine Kahn

Attorney at Law Office of Geri N. Kahn

465 California Street, Suite 607

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/14/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Caryn Lee Testa.. (Kahn, Geri) (Filed on 8/31/2020) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Kahn, Geri) (Filed on 8/31/2020) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Decision of Commissioner of Social Security against Andrew Saul ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14882660.). Filed byCaryn Lee Testa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kahn, Geri) (Filed on 8/31/2020) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less