This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2019 at 06:09:15 (UTC).

T.E.S.T. v. Doe Run Resources Corporation, The et al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by T E S T against Doe Run Resources Corporation, The in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03010

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney W. Sippel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chris Collins

T. E.S. T.

Defendants

Renco Holdings, Inc.

Jerry Pyatt

Ira L. Rennert

The Renco Group, Inc.

Doe Run Resources Corporation, The

Marvin K. Kaiser

D.R. Acquisition Corp.

Theodore P. Fox, III

Jeffrey L. Zelms

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

D. Todd Mathews

Attorney at THE GORI LAW FIRM

156 N. Main St.

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Hunter J. Shkolnik

Attorney at NAPOLI SHKOLNIK PLLC

360 Lexington Avenue, 11Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Wilson D. Sikes

Attorney at NAPOLI SHKOLNIK PLLC

103 W. Vandalia Street, Suite 475

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey R. Hoops

Attorney at DOWD BENNETT, LLP

7733 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1900

Clayton, MO 63105

Edward L. Dowd, Jr.

Attorney at DOWD BENNETT, LLP

7733 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1900

Clayton, MO 63105

Thomas P. Berra, Jr.

Attorney at LEWIS RICE, LLC

600 Washington, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63101

Andrew Rothschild

Attorney at LEWIS RICE, LLC

600 Washington, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63101

Michael J. Hickey

Attorney at LEWIS RICE, LLC

600 Washington, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 1 of 2

1 #6

Original Filing Form

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2

#5

(#5) ORDER: [COPY OF ORDER AS ENTERED IN 4:15CV1704RWS]... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' agreed motion to consolidate cases A.Y.A.S. v. Doe Run Resources Corp., 4:19 CV 2572 JAR; A.J.A.C. v. Doe Run Resources Corp., 4:19 CV 2578 JAR; and S.E.A.C. v. Doe Run Resources Corp., 4:19 CV 2580 AGF with the present case 357 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall open and randomly assign a new case for each Plaintiff (or two related Plaintiffs) using the complaint filed in each of these three respective cases. See Order for full details. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/4/19. (LMY) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, case number 1922-cc10969, with receipt number AMOEDC-7463391, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by The Renco Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form, #7 Supplement State Court File)(Dowd, Edward) Modified on 11/7/2019 (LMY). (Entered: 09/16/2019)

1 #7

Supplement State Court File

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 3

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Doe Run Resources Corporation, The, Theodore P. Fox, III, Marvin K. Kaiser, Jerry Pyatt, Jeffrey L. Zelms.(LMY) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by D.R. Acquisition Corp., Renco Holdings, Inc., Ira L. Rennert, The Renco Group, Inc..(LMY) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 2 of 2

#2

(#2) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis City, filed by plaintiffs.(LMY) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. (MRC) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: [COPY OF ORDER AS ENTERED IN 4:15CV1704RWS]... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' agreed motion to consolidate cases A.Y.A.S. v. Doe Run Resources Corp., 4:19 CV 2572 JAR; A.J.A.C. v. Doe Run Resources Corp., 4:19 CV 2578 JAR; and S.E.A.C. v. Doe Run Resources Corp., 4:19 CV 2580 AGF with the present case 357 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall open and randomly assign a new case for each Plaintiff (or two related Plaintiffs) using the complaint filed in each of these three respective cases. See Order for full details. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/4/19. (LMY) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint by D.R. Acquisition Corp., Renco Holdings, Inc., Ira L. Rennert, The Renco Group, Inc..(LMY) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Doe Run Resources Corporation, The, Theodore P. Fox, III, Marvin K. Kaiser, Jerry Pyatt, Jeffrey L. Zelms.(LMY) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis City, filed by plaintiffs.(LMY) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, case number 1922-cc10969, with receipt number AMOEDC-7463391, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by The Renco Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form, #7 Supplement State Court File)(Dowd, Edward) Modified on 11/7/2019 (LMY). (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.