This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2019 at 07:15:57 (UTC).

Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC v. United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A F L -C I O Local 675. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cormac J. Carney and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-08853

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC

Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC

Defendant

UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED-INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, A.F.L.-C.I.O. LOCAL 675

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kamran Mirrafati

Attorney at Foley and Lardner LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2411

Defendant Attorneys

Jay Edward Smith

Attorney at Gilbert and Sackman ALC

3699 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90010-2732

Joshua B Adams

Attorney at Gilbert and Sackman A Law Corporation

3699 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) JUDGMENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. As set out in its concurrently issued Order, the Court finds that this dispute is not ripe for judicial review. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1). (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iv) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Adams, Joshua) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #11 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Union's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Tesoro may file a subsequent challenge to the Arbitrator's ruling after the Award is finalized. (iv) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#15

(#15) REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #11 filed by Defendant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675. (Adams, Joshua) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#14

(#14) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #11 filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC. (Mirrafati, Kamran) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jay Edward Smith on behalf of Defendant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675 (Attorney Jay Edward Smith added to party United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675(pty:dft))(Smith, Jay) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Order re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #11 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adams, Joshua) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

12 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675, identifying Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC; Jason Davis; and United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675. (Attorney Joshua B Adams added to party United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675(pty:dft))(Adams, Joshua) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24607780 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Attorney Kamran Mirrafati added to party Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC(pty:pla))(Mirrafati, Kamran) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675. (iv) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Mirrafati, Kamran) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: Please put for the Central District of California. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, (Mirrafati, Kamran) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Mirrafati, Kamran) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) JUDGMENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. As set out in its concurrently issued Order, the Court finds that this dispute is not ripe for judicial review. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1). (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iv) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #11 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Union's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Tesoro may file a subsequent challenge to the Arbitrator's ruling after the Award is finalized. (iv) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #11 filed by Defendant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675. (Adams, Joshua) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #11 filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC. (Mirrafati, Kamran) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jay Edward Smith on behalf of Defendant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675 (Attorney Jay Edward Smith added to party United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675(pty:dft))(Smith, Jay) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Order re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #11 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adams, Joshua) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Adams, Joshua) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675, identifying Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC; Jason Davis; and United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675. (Attorney Joshua B Adams added to party United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675(pty:dft))(Adams, Joshua) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675. (iv) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Summons Request #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #7 filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC. (Mirrafati, Kamran) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: Please put for the Central District of California. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, (Mirrafati, Kamran) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Mirrafati, Kamran) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Mirrafati, Kamran) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24607780 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Attorney Kamran Mirrafati added to party Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC(pty:pla))(Mirrafati, Kamran) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.