This case was last updated from PACER on 10/01/2019 at 07:40:43 (UTC).

Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC v. Alanddon LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2019 Tesoro Refining Marketing Company, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Alanddon LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are William G. Cobb and Larry R. Hicks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00449

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

William G. Cobb

Presiding Judge

Larry R. Hicks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC

Defendants

Alanddon LLC

Valarie M Lehr

Allan G Fiegehen

Donald A Lehr

Kristine A Fiegehen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Griffith H Hayes

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

3993 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 100

Las Vegas, NV 89109

Ryan Benjamin Zimmer

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

3993 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 100

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Defendant Attorney

Ryan D. Russell

Attorney at Allison, MacKenzie, et al.

402 North Division Street, P.O. Box 646

Carson City, NV 89702

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Exhibit

12 #1

Exhibit

#12

(#12) MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem by Defendant Allan G Fiegehen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Russell, Ryan) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Alanddon LLC, Allan G Fiegehen, Donald A Lehr, Valarie M Lehr. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Russell, Ryan) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

1 #2

Summons Summons - Alanddon LLC

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons Summons - Donald A Lehr

1 #4

Summons Summons - Valerie M Lehr

1 #5

Summons Summons - Allan G Fiegehen

1 #6

Summons Summons - Kristine A Fiegehen

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5648017) by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC. Proof of service due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - Alanddon LLC, #3 Summons Summons - Donald A Lehr, #4 Summons Summons - Valerie M Lehr, #5 Summons Summons - Allan G Fiegehen, #6 Summons Summons - Kristine A Fiegehen)(Hayes, Griffith) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Alanddon LLC, Allan G Fiegehen, Donald A Lehr, Valarie M Lehr. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/3/2019.(Russell, Ryan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint: Order by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC. (Zimmer, Ryan) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting ECF No. #8 Stipulation : Defendants should answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before Thursday, September 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

3 #3

Allan G. Fiegehen

3 #4

Kristine A. Fiegehen

3 #1

Donald A. Lehr

3 #2

Valerie M. Lehr

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem by Defendant Allan G Fiegehen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Russell, Ryan) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Alanddon LLC, Allan G Fiegehen, Donald A Lehr, Valarie M Lehr. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Russell, Ryan) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Alanddon LLC, Allan G Fiegehen, Donald A Lehr, Valarie M Lehr. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/3/2019.(Russell, Ryan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting ECF No. #8 Stipulation : Defendants should answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before Thursday, September 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint: Order by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC. (Zimmer, Ryan) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. Allan G Fiegehen served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Zimmer, Ryan) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Valarie Lehr re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC. (Hayes, Griffith) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Donald Lehr re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC. (Hayes, Griffith) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Alanddon LLC re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC. (Hayes, Griffith) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Donald A. Lehr, #2 Valerie M. Lehr, #3 Allan G. Fiegehen, #4 Kristine A. Fiegehen) (DRM) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (LE) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Western Refining Southwest, Inc, Corporate Parent Giant Industries, Inc., Corporate Parent Western Refining, Inc., Corporate Parent Andeavor LLC, Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation for Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC added. (Hayes, Griffith) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5648017) by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC. Proof of service due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - Alanddon LLC, #3 Summons Summons - Donald A Lehr, #4 Summons Summons - Valerie M Lehr, #5 Summons Summons - Allan G Fiegehen, #6 Summons Summons - Kristine A Fiegehen)(Hayes, Griffith) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.