Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/12/2021 at 15:45:46 (UTC).

Terzneh v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Terzneh filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Federal National Mortgage Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and Thomas L. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02228

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

Thomas L. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Messeret Terzneh

Defendants

Jacob Tigert

Federal National Mortgage Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PAUL ROBINSON

287 Madison Ave.

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorney

John R. Candy

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JOHN CANDY

358 New Byhalia

Collierville, TN 38017

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Exhibit proposed amended complaint

12 #1

Exhibit purchase offer

#12

(#12) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit purchase offer, #2 Exhibit proposed amended complaint)(Robinson, Paul) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Messeret Terzneh. (Robinson, Paul) (Entered: 05/31/2021)

#10

(#10) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jacob Tigert. (Candy, John) NOTE: This is a refiling of #8 , and exhibits are attached to that docket entry (cbs). (Entered: 05/05/2021)

8 #2

Exhibit history of case ehibits

8 #1

Exhibit history of case exhibits

#8

(#8) First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jacob Tigert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit history of case exhibits, #2 Exhibit history of case ehibits)(Candy, John) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Jacob Tigert. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Federal National Mortgage Association. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#2

(#2) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (agj) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT And Petition for Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3586263), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robinson, Paul) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #12 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by Messeret Terzneh has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: the motion does not have a certificate of consultation. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (agj) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit purchase offer, #2 Exhibit proposed amended complaint)(Robinson, Paul) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Messeret Terzneh. (Robinson, Paul) (Entered: 05/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jacob Tigert. (Candy, John) NOTE: This is a refiling of #8 , and exhibits are attached to that docket entry (cbs). (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #8 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jacob Tigert has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: the pleading has a "wet" signature and not the required electronic signature. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (agj) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jacob Tigert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit history of case exhibits, #2 Exhibit history of case ehibits)(Candy, John) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Jacob Tigert. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Federal National Mortgage Association. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (agj) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT And Petition for Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3586263), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robinson, Paul) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal National Mortgage Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul A. Robinson, Jr.