This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2020 at 08:30:00 (UTC).

Terwey et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 Terwey filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are John R. Tunheim, Hildy Bowbeer and Tony N. Leung. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-02203

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Tunheim

Referral Judges

Hildy Bowbeer

Tony N. Leung

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Timothy Terwey

Jodi Terwey

Defendants

Ethicon, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yvonne M Flaherty

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP

100 Washington Ave S Ste 2200

Mpls, MN 55401-2179

Dana Lizik

Attorney at Johnson Law Group

2925 Richmond Avenue, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77098

Allison Whitten

Attorney at Johnson Law Group

2925 Richmond Avenue, Suite 1700, Tx

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Tracy J Van Steenburgh

Attorney at Nilan Johnson Lewis PA

250 Marquette Avenue South, Suite 800

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Brandie L Morgenroth

Attorney at Nilan Johnson Lewis PA

120 S 6Th St Ste 400

Mpls, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER on #14 Stipulation. Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before January 4, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/16/2020. (HAM) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#15

(#15) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 Stipulation. (Morgenroth, Brandie) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Jointly Signed by Jodi Terwey and Timothy Terwey. (Morgenroth, Brandie) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Allison Whitten. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8308606 filed by Jodi Terwey, Timothy Terwey. (Flaherty, Yvonne) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER on #10 Stipulation. Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwiserespond to the Complaint on or before December 18, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/30/2020. (HAM) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#11

(#11) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (Morgenroth, Brandie) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Jointly Signed by Jodi Terwey and Timothy Terwey. (Morgenroth, Brandie) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandie L Morgenroth on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Morgenroth, Brandie) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit(s) Proof of Service of Defendants' by Electronic Mail

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jodi Terwey, Timothy Terwey. Ethicon, Inc. served on 10/28/2020, answer due 11/18/2020; Johnson & Johnson served on 10/28/2020, answer due 11/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proof of Service of Defendants' by Electronic Mail)(Lizik, Dana) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-2203 JRT/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/22/2020.(CLK) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dana Lizik. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8160275 filed by Jodi Terwey, Timothy Terwey. (Flaherty, Yvonne) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (CLK) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8157100) filed by Jodi Terwey, Timothy Terwey. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Flaherty, Yvonne) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Allison Whitten for Jodi Terwey and for Timothy Terwey. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/17/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER on #14 Stipulation. Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before January 4, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/16/2020. (HAM) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 Stipulation. (Morgenroth, Brandie) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Jointly Signed by Jodi Terwey and Timothy Terwey. (Morgenroth, Brandie) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Allison Whitten. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8308606 filed by Jodi Terwey, Timothy Terwey. (Flaherty, Yvonne) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER on #10 Stipulation. Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwiserespond to the Complaint on or before December 18, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/30/2020. (HAM) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (Morgenroth, Brandie) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Jointly Signed by Jodi Terwey and Timothy Terwey. (Morgenroth, Brandie) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandie L Morgenroth on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Morgenroth, Brandie) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jodi Terwey, Timothy Terwey. Ethicon, Inc. served on 10/28/2020, answer due 11/18/2020; Johnson & Johnson served on 10/28/2020, answer due 11/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proof of Service of Defendants' by Electronic Mail)(Lizik, Dana) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Dana Lizik for Jodi Terwey and for Timothy Terwey. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/23/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-2203 JRT/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/22/2020.(CLK) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dana Lizik. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8160275 filed by Jodi Terwey, Timothy Terwey. (Flaherty, Yvonne) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docket(#4) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Dana Lizik as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (CLK) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (CLK) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 20-cv-2203 JRT/HB. (CLK) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8157100) filed by Jodi Terwey, Timothy Terwey. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Flaherty, Yvonne) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allison Elizabeth Whitten

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YVONNE FLAHERTY