This case was last updated from PACER on 07/09/2021 at 07:32:46 (UTC).

Terry Prim v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 Terry Prim filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen V. Wilson and John E. McDermott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03933

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terry Prim

Defendants

The Coca-Cola Company Accidental Death and Dismemberment Insurance Plan

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael B Horrow

Attorney at Donahue and Horrow LLP

1960 East Grand Avenue Suite 1215

El Segundo, CA 90245

Scott E Calvert

Attorney at Donahue and Horrow LLP

1960 East Grand Avenue Suite 1215

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant Attorney

Robert E Hess

Attorney at Hinshaw and Culbertson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 7/30/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, The Coca-Cola Company Accidental Death and Dismemberment Insurance Plan, (Hess, Robert) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, The Coca-Cola Company Accidental Death and Dismemberment Insurance Plan identifying MetLife, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Hess, Robert) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, The Coca-Cola Company Accidental Death and Dismemberment Insurance Plan.(Hess, Robert) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company answer now due 7/2/2021; The Coca-Cola Company Accidental Death and Dismemberment Insurance Plan answer now due 7/2/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company; The Coca-Cola Company Accidental Death and Dismemberment Insurance Plan.(Attorney Robert E Hess added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Robert E Hess added to party The Coca-Cola Company Accidental Death and Dismemberment Insurance Plan(pty:dft))(Hess, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#8

(#8) NEW CASE ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (jre) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Terry Prim, identifying Terry Prim, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, The Coca-Cola Company Accidental Death & Dismemberment Insurance Plan. (Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Terry Prim. (Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31267054 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Terry Prim. (Attorney Michael B Horrow added to party Terry Prim(pty:pla))(Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The initial status conference previously scheduled for 07/30/2021 at 3:00 p.m. has been rescheduled to 8/30/2021 at 3:00 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 7/30/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, The Coca-Cola Company Accidental Death and Dismemberment Insurance Plan, (Hess, Robert) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, The Coca-Cola Company Accidental Death and Dismemberment Insurance Plan identifying MetLife, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Hess, Robert) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, The Coca-Cola Company Accidental Death and Dismemberment Insurance Plan.(Hess, Robert) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company answer now due 7/2/2021; The Coca-Cola Company Accidental Death and Dismemberment Insurance Plan answer now due 7/2/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company; The Coca-Cola Company Accidental Death and Dismemberment Insurance Plan.(Attorney Robert E Hess added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Robert E Hess added to party The Coca-Cola Company Accidental Death and Dismemberment Insurance Plan(pty:dft))(Hess, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NEW CASE ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (jre) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, The Coca-Cola Company Accidental Death and Dismemberment Insurance Plan. (Attachments: #1 Summons for The Coca-Cola Company Accidental Death and Dismemberment Insurance Plan) (ghap) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Terry Prim, identifying Terry Prim, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, The Coca-Cola Company Accidental Death & Dismemberment Insurance Plan. (Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Terry Prim. (Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Terry Prim. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request)(Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31267054 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Terry Prim. (Attorney Michael B Horrow added to party Terry Prim(pty:pla))(Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where THE COCA-COLA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott E Calvert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Brian Horrow