This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 12:15:30 (UTC).

Terry Lusk et al v. C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 Terry Lusk filed an Other - Agriculture Subsidy lawsuit against C H Robinson Worldwide, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patrick J. Schiltz and Hildy Bowbeer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-00879

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Agriculture Subsidy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Schiltz

Referral Judge

Hildy Bowbeer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Terry Lusk, Individually and d/b/a JTJ Farms

JMR Farms, Inc.

Justin Lusk, Individually and d/b/a JTJ Farms

Jason Lusk, Individually and d/b/a JTJ Farms

Terry Lusk

Justin Lusk

Jason Lusk

Justin Lusk individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated doing business as JTJ Farms

Jason Lusk individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated doing business as JTJ Farms

Terry Lusk individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated doing business as JTJ Farms

Defendants

C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.

C.H. Robinson Company, Inc.

C.H. Robinson Company

Special Master

Special Master

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig A Stokes

Attorney at Stokes Law Office LLP

3330 Oakwell Court Ste 225

San Antonio, TX 78218

Andrew T Thomasson

Attorney at Stern Thomasson LLP

150 Morris Avenue, 2Nd Floor

Springfield, NJ 07081-1315

Robert Andrew Pollom

Attorney at The Law Offices of Robert A. Pollom, LLC

16500 San Pedro, Suite 302

San Antonio, TX 78232

Philip D Stern

Attorney at Stern Thomasson LLP

150 Morris Avenue, 2Nd Floor, 07081, Ste 2Nd Floor

Springfield, NJ 07081

Francis Greene

Attorney at Stern Thomasson LLP

150 Morris Avenue, Ste 2Nd Floor

Springfield, NJ 07081

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley Richard Hutter

Attorney at Fafinski Mark & Johnson, P.A.

775 Prairie Center Drive, Suite 400

Eden Prairie, MN 55344

Peter J. Wozniak

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

One North Wacker Drive, Suite 4400

Chicago, IL 60606-2883

Adina R Florea

Attorney at Fafinski Mark & Johnson

775 Prairie Center Dr, Ste 400

Eden Prairie, MN 55344

Patrick J Rooney

Attorney at Fafinski Mark & Johnson, P.A.

Suite 400, 775 Prairie Center Drive

Eden Prairie, MN 55344

Mark William Wallin

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

One North Wacker Drive, Suite 4400

Chicago, IL 60606

Special Master Attorney

Richard B Solum

Attorney at Mpls, MN

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#10

9 #2

Proposed Order

9 #1

Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel

#9

8 #2

Proposed Order

8 #1

Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel

#8

7 #2

Proposed Order

7 #1

Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Wallin on behalf of C.H. Robinson Company, C.H. Robinson Company, Inc., C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. (Hutter, Bradley) Modified text on 5/18/2020 (MMP). (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Wozniak on behalf of C.H. Robinson Company, C.H. Robinson Company, Inc., C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. (Hutter, Bradley) Modified text on 5/18/2020 (MMP). (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Special Master, Richard B. Solum appointed. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 5/15/2020.(CLG) Modified text on 5/15/2020 (MMP). (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Rule 53 Declaration of Richard B. Solum. (JMK) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peter J. Wozniak. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7701914 filed by C.H. Robinson Company, C.H. Robinson Company, Inc., C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Rooney, Patrick) Modified text on 5/7/2020 (NAH). (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark Wallin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7701870 filed by C.H. Robinson Company, C.H. Robinson Company, Inc., C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Rooney, Patrick) Modified text on 5/7/2020 (NAH). (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Richard Hutter on behalf of C.H. Robinson Company, C.H. Robinson Company, Inc., C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Hutter, Bradley) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Adina R Florea on behalf of C.H. Robinson Company, C.H. Robinson Company, Inc., C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Florea, Adina) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J Rooney on behalf of C.H. Robinson Company, C.H. Robinson Company, Inc., C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Rooney, Patrick) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Terry Lusk, JMR Farms, Inc., Justin Lusk, Jason Lusk. C.H. Robinson Company waiver sent on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020; C.H. Robinson Company, Inc. waiver sent on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020; C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. waiver sent on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew T Thomasson for JMR Farms, Inc., Jason Lusk, Justin Lusk, and for Terry Lusk; granting #7 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Philip D Stern for JMR Farms, Inc., Jason Lusk, Justin Lusk, and for Terry Lusk; granting #8 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Francis Greene for JMR Farms, Inc., Jason Lusk, Justin Lusk, and for Terry Lusk; granting #9 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert Andrew Pollom for JMR Farms, Inc., Jason Lusk, Justin Lusk, and for Terry Lusk. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 4/16/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert Pollom. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7645154 filed by JMR Farms, Inc., Jason Lusk, Justin Lusk, Terry Lusk. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel, #2 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Francis R. Greene. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7644920 filed by JMR Farms, Inc., Jason Lusk, Justin Lusk, Terry Lusk. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel, #2 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Philip D. Stern. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7644900 filed by JMR Farms, Inc., Jason Lusk, Justin Lusk, Terry Lusk. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel, #2 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew T. Thomasson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7644873 filed by JMR Farms, Inc., Jason Lusk, Justin Lusk, Terry Lusk. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel, #2 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • Docket(#5) (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer for all further proceedings. Judge Nancy E. Brasel, Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-879 (PJS/HB). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 4/10/2020. (KNK) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to C.H. Robinson Company, C.H. Robinson Company, Inc., C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. (KDS) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-879 NEB/DTS. (KDS) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint for Violations of the PACA and various state laws against C.H. Robinson Company, C.H. Robinson Company, Inc., C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7617488) filed by Terry Lusk, Individually and d/b/a JTJ Farms, JMR Farms, Inc., Justin Lusk, Individually and d/b/a JTJ Farms, Jason Lusk, Individually and d/b/a JTJ Farms. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- JTJ Farms Contracts, #2 Exhibit 2 - JMR Farms Contracts, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CH Robinson Company is a litigant