This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:02:23 (UTC).

Terri Stivers v. Monarch Recovery Management, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Other case was filed by Terri Stivers against Monarch Recovery Management, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01155

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Dale A. Drozd

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terri Stivers

Defendant

Monarch Recovery Management, Inc.

 

Court Documents

3 #3

VDRP

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Monarch Recovery Management, Inc. re #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Notice of Appearance, #7 Answer to Complaint. (Sabnis, Rohit) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

10 #1

Certificate of Record of Good Standing for R. Metcho

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Monarch Recovery Management, Inc.. (Sabnis, Rohit) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#5

(#5) DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Terri Stivers. (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A - May 30, 2019 Letter

3 #2

Consent Form

#4

(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Terri Stivers served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Rohit Sabnis on behalf of Monarch Recovery Management, Inc.. Attorney Sabnis, Rohit added. (Sabnis, Rohit) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Monarch Recovery Management, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Russell Snow Thompson, IV* *Thompson Consumer Law Group* *5235 E Southern Ave., D106-618* *Mesa, AZ 85206*. (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER by Monarch Recovery Management, Inc..(Sabnis, Rohit) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

3 #1

EPG Sch Conf

#10

(#10) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Monarch Recovery Management, Inc. for attorney Ronald Michael Metcho II to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8497500) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record of Good Standing for R. Metcho, #2 Proof of Service for R. Metcho Pro Hac Vice Application and Certificate of Good Standing)(Sabnis, Rohit) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#11

(#11) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/3/19. Added attorney Ronald M. Metcho, PHV for Monarch Recovery Management, Inc. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/3/19. Added attorney Ronald M. Metcho, PHV for Monarch Recovery Management, Inc. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Monarch Recovery Management, Inc. for attorney Ronald Michael Metcho II to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8497500) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record of Good Standing for R. Metcho, #2 Proof of Service for R. Metcho Pro Hac Vice Application and Certificate of Good Standing)(Sabnis, Rohit) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Monarch Recovery Management, Inc. re #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Notice of Appearance, #7 Answer to Complaint. (Sabnis, Rohit) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Monarch Recovery Management, Inc.. (Sabnis, Rohit) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER by Monarch Recovery Management, Inc..(Sabnis, Rohit) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Rohit Sabnis on behalf of Monarch Recovery Management, Inc.. Attorney Sabnis, Rohit added. (Sabnis, Rohit) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Terri Stivers. (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Terri Stivers served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 EPG Sch Conf, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Monarch Recovery Management, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Russell Snow Thompson, IV* *Thompson Consumer Law Group* *5235 E Southern Ave., D106-618* *Mesa, AZ 85206*. (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Monarch Recovery Management, Inc. by Terri Stivers. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8422631) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - May 30, 2019 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less