This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/17/2021 at 07:38:06 (UTC).

Terri Leith v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 Terri Leith filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Madeline Hughes Haikala. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00691

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Madeline Hughes Haikala

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Donna Clark

Bonnie Crawford

Willie Morgan

Jacqueline Capponi

Virdona Strube

Debra Galbraith

Amparo Libreros

Annette Barrows

Mary Albecker

Debbie Horton

Linda Kuenzli

Violet Rappuchi

Martha Serres

Elizabeth Mustin

Kimberly Schuler

Natalie Jackson

Doris Castilleja

Sandra Bailey

Cheryl Murphy

Defendant

DOES 1 through 500

78 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J R Vaughan

Attorney at ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS

649 Monroe Street, Room 1801

Montgomery, AL 36131-2220

Scott A. Love

Attorney at Clark Love and Hutson PLLC

440 Louisiana Street Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Daniel S. Robinson

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie Inc

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

CLAYTON A. CLARK

Attorney at CLARK LOVE & HUTSON

440 Louisiana St., Ste. 1600

Houston, TX 77002

Mark P Robinson, Jr

Attorney at ROBINSON & PHILLIPS

110 Laurel Street

San Diego, CA 92101

Amanda C. Robinson

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie Robinson Shapiro Davis Inc

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Shannon Lukei

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie Inc

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Karen Barth Menzies

Attorney at Gibbs Law Group LLP

6701 Civil Drive West 14Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90045

William M Moreland

Attorney at Clark, Love & Hutson, PLLC

440 Louisiana Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Other Attorneys

Susan M. Robinson

Attorney at THOMAS COMBS & SPANN

P. O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

David B. Thomas

Attorney at THOMAS COMBS & SPANN

P. O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Adam D Peavy

Attorney at FLEMING & ASSOCIATES LLP

1330 Post Oak Blvd, Suite 3030

Houston, TX 77056-3019

Joshua J. Wes

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

William M. Gage

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Kari L. Sutherland

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 1138

Oxford, MS 38655

Mollie Fleming Benedict

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

Christy D Jones

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW O'MARA STEVENS & CANNADA PLLC

Deposit Guaranty Plaza, Suite 1700, Po Box 22567

Jackson, MS 39225-2567

Lauren H. Bragin

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Kathryn Grace Hooten

Attorney at CLARK LOVE & HUTSON PLLC

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

P Leigh O'Dell

Attorney at BEASLEY ALLEN CROW METHVIN PORTIS & MILES PC

218 Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

128 #2

Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, Kathryn Hooten

128 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Kathryn Hooten

#128

127 #2

Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, William Moreland

127 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of William Moreland

#127

#125

#124

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #2

Part 2 to Exhibits

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

1 #2

Part 2 of Exhibits

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

202 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3885066. (Hooten, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Attorneys William Michael Moreland's and Kathryn Grace Hooten's motions for admission pro hac vice in this action. (Docs. #127 , #128 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/15/2021. (YMB) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3883152. (Moreland, William) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) First MOTION for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE by Terri Leith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Kathryn Hooten, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, Kathryn Hooten)(O'Dell, P) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) First MOTION for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE by Terri Leith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of William Moreland, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, William Moreland)(O'Dell, P) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) TEXT ORDER: The parties have filed a joint motion for mediation referral and for an extension of the current stay of unexpired deadlines. (Doc. #125 ). The parties have informed the Court that Judge Blackburn is willing to mediate this case this autumn if the Court refers the case for mediation. The Court is grateful to Judge Blackburn for her willingness to assist the parties and refers this matter to her for mediation. The Court stays all deadlines in this case until 15 days after the parties complete mediation. At the conclusion of mediation, the parties shall file a joint status report updating the Court on the status of their mediation efforts. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/13/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#125) Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Motion for Mediation Referral and to Extend Stay of All Deadlines in this Case by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Walker, Caroline) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#124) NOTICE of Appearance by P Leigh O'Dell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (O'Dell, P) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docket(#123) TEXT ORDER: Consistent with the discussion held during the Telephonic Status Conference on 6/15/2021, the Court stays all deadlines in this action for 60 days to allow the parties to pursue mediation. On or before 8/18/2021, the parties shall please file a joint report updating the Court on the status of the mediation. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 6/15/2021. (YMB) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/15/2021. Order to follow. (No Court Reporter.) (YMB) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
112 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 14-03 (identical case) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. Case number now reads as 2:14-cv-7392 JGB(SPx). (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.] [Transferred from California Central on 5/18/2021.] (Entered: 10/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 14-03 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Case transferred from Judge Margaret M. Morrow to the calendar of Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as CV 14-07392 FMO(Ex). (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.] [Transferred from California Central on 5/18/2021.] (Entered: 09/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Scott A Love for Plaintiffs Mary Albecker, Connie Arnette, Sandra Bailey, Fran Banach, Annette Barrows, Nicole Bettin, Sally Bissell, Karin Boyer, Deline Boyse, Dorothy Breytenbach, Debbie Brock, Malissa Brown, Jacoueline Capponi, Katherine Carnahan, Doris Castilleja, Donna Clark, Peggy Clawson, Andrea Cogley, Tammy Cook, Bonnie Crawford, Linda Davis, Paula Davis, Patricia De La Fuentte, Peggy Dosch, Patricia Edenborg-Gorman, Llewelly Edwards, Darlene Endl, Nancy Esidor, Marsha Faircloth, Rosemary Flores, Jacouelyn Friend, Debra Galbraith, Rosa Graciani, Glenda Griffin, Betty Jean Hall, Debra Hammitt, Debbie Horton, Angela Howard, Sharon Iverson, Natalie Jackson, Josephine Karstetter, Barbara King, Gwendolyn Knox, Linda Kuenzli, Terri Leith, Amparo Libreros, Martha Lopez, Paula Lubinsky, Michelle Marini, Lorna Marple, Gina McSweeney, Janet Meacham, Faith Meyer, Irene Mikula, Maria Morales, Amy Moreira, Willie Morgan, Sharon Mullay, Cheryl Murphy, Susan Murzycki, Elizabeth Mustin, JoAnne Nichols, Rose Ellen Pepsin, Rebecca Peterson, Carolanne Potts, Deborah Proctor, Jeri Pryor, Jo Ann Pugh, Gloria Ramirez, Lisa Ramirez, Carol Ranson, Violet Rappuchi, Alice Revells, Georgia Rich, Jennifer Riddle, Andrea Robin, Debbie Robinson, Terenitia Rodriguez, Tina Samaniego, Beatriz Sandoval, Kimberly Schuler, Nina Schultz, Martha Serres, Janice Simons, Kandyce Singletary, Mamie Stanga, Charlotte Storms, Virdona Strube, Sheree Sweetland, Susann Thrasher, Ottie Turnmyre, Beryl Velguth, Maria White, Cathy Wilson, Daria Worley. re Notice of Removal, #1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.][Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.] [Transferred from California Central on 5/18/2021.] (Entered: 09/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Clayton A Clark for Plaintiffs Mary Albecker, Connie Arnette, Sandra Bailey, Fran Banach, Annette Barrows, Nicole Bettin, Sally Bissell, Karin Boyer, Deline Boyse, Dorothy Breytenbach, Debbie Brock, Malissa Brown, Jacoueline Capponi, Katherine Carnahan, Doris Castilleja, Donna Clark, Peggy Clawson, Andrea Cogley, Tammy Cook, Bonnie Crawford, Linda Davis, Paula Davis, Patricia De La Fuentte, Peggy Dosch, Patricia Edenborg-Gorman, Llewelly Edwards, Darlene Endl, Nancy Esidor, Marsha Faircloth, Rosemary Flores, Jacouelyn Friend, Debra Galbraith, Rosa Graciani, Glenda Griffin, Betty Jean Hall, Debra Hammitt, Debbie Horton, Angela Howard, Sharon Iverson, Natalie Jackson, Josephine Karstetter, Barbara King, Gwendolyn Knox, Linda Kuenzli, Terri Leith, Amparo Libreros, Martha Lopez, Paula Lubinsky, Michelle Marini, Lorna Marple, Gina McSweeney, Janet Meacham, Faith Meyer, Irene Mikula, Maria Morales, Amy Moreira, Willie Morgan, Sharon Mullay, Cheryl Murphy, Susan Murzycki, Elizabeth Mustin, JoAnne Nichols, Rose Ellen Pepsin, Rebecca Peterson, Carolanne Potts, Deborah Proctor, Jeri Pryor, Jo Ann Pugh, Gloria Ramirez, Lisa Ramirez, Carol Ranson, Violet Rappuchi, Alice Revells, Georgia Rich, Jennifer Riddle, Andrea Robin, Debbie Robinson, Terenitia Rodriguez, Tina Samaniego, Beatriz Sandoval, Kimberly Schuler, Nina Schultz, Martha Serres, Janice Simons, Kandyce Singletary, Mamie Stanga, Charlotte Storms, Virdona Strube, Sheree Sweetland, Susann Thrasher, Ottie Turnmyre, Beryl Velguth, Maria White, Cathy Wilson, Daria Worley. re Notice of Removal, #1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.] [Transferred from California Central on 5/18/2021.] (Entered: 09/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.] [Transferred from California Central on 5/18/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Margaret M. Morrow and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.] [Transferred from California Central on 5/18/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) and Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. Related Case(s): 8:14-cv-00591-JGB (SPx); 8:14-cv-00596-LGB (SPx); 2:14-cv-02916-JGB (SPx) and 2:14-cv-02915-JGB (SPx). (et) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.] [Transferred from California Central on 5/18/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATION AS TO Interested Parties filed by Defemdants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson, identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Ethicon Inc; Corporate Parent Ethicon PR Holdings, Corporate Parent EES Holdings de Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V. for Ethicon LLC. (et) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.] [Transferred from California Central on 5/18/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of JOSHUA J. WES in Support of Notice of Removal #1 filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. [STATE COURT CONFORMED FILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A.] (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2014: #1 Exhibit, #2 Part 2 to Exhibits) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.] [Transferred from California Central on 5/18/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of Los Angeles, case number BC536366 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint, attached to Declaration of Joshua J. Weis to Exhibit A. Case assigned to Judge Margaret M. Morrow, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (Filing fee $400 PAID.), filed by Defendants Ethicon LLC, Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2014: #1 Exhibit, #2 Part 2 of Exhibits) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.] [Transferred from California Central on 5/18/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathryn Grace Hooten

Latest cases represented by Lawyer P. Leigh O'Dell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam D. Peavy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua J Wes