This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2021 at 11:20:51 (UTC).

Terri Leith v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 Terri Leith filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dean D. Pregerson, Pedro V. Castillo and Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00078

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

Presiding Judges

Dean D. Pregerson

Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Donna Clark

Bonnie Crawford

Willie Morgan

Jacqueline Capponi

Virdona Strube

Debra Galbraith

Amparo Libreros

Annette Barrows

Mary Albecker

Debbie Horton

Linda Kuenzli

Violet Rappuchi

Martha Serres

Elizabeth Mustin

Kimberly Schuler

Natalie Jackson

Doris Castilleja

Sandra Bailey

Cheryl Murphy

Defendant

DOES 1 through 500

78 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark P. Robinson, Jr.

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie Inc

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Scott A. Love

Attorney at Clark Love and Hutson PLLC

440 Louisiana Street Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Shannon Lukei

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie Inc

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Clayton A. Clark

Attorney at Clark Love and Hutson GP

440 Louisiana Street Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77002

Amanda C. Robinson

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie Robinson Shapiro Davis Inc

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Daniel S. Robinson

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie Inc

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Karen Barth Menzies

Attorney at Gibbs Law Group LLP

6701 Civil Drive West 14Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Jeffrey R. Vaughan

Attorney at Clark Love and Hutson PLLC

440 Louisiana Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77002

William Michael Moreland

Attorney at CLARK LOVE & HUTSON

Suite 1600, 440 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

William M. Moreland

Attorney at Clark Love and Hutson GP

440 Louisiana, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Other Attorneys

David B. Thomas

Attorney at Thomas Combs and Spann PLLC

P.O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Joshua J. Wes

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

Christy D. Jones

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP

P.O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Susan M. Robinson

Attorney at Thomas Combs and Spann PLLC

P.O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Kari L. Sutherland

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP

P.O. Box 1138

Oxford, MS 38655

William M. Gage

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP

P.O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Lauren H. Bragin

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Mollie Fleming Benedict

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

Adam D. Peavy

Attorney at Clark Love and Hutson PLLC

440 Louisiana Street Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#112

#111

#110

#109

#106

#105

#101

95 #1

Proposed Order

#95

#5

#4

#3

2 #2

Part 2 to Exhibits

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

1 #2

Part 2 of Exhibits

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

169 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2021 at 02:00 PM. (wm) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William M. Moreland counsel for Plaintiff Terri Leith. Jeffrey Vaughan is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Terri Leith. (Moreland, William) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William M. Moreland counsel for Plaintiff Terri Leith. Clayton A. Clark is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Terri Leith. (Moreland, William) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY #95 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IS HEREBY GRANTED. The following attorneys from Tucker Ellis LLP shall be counsel of record for Defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson: Mollie F. Benedict, State Bar No. 187084; Joshua J. Wes, State Bar No. 238541; and Nicholas V. Janizeh, State Bar No. 307816 and the following attorneys will be withdrawn as counsel: Christy D. Jones of Butler Snow; William M. Gage of Butler Snow; Kari L. Sutherland of Butler Snow; David B. Thomas of Thomas Combs & Spann; Susan M. Robinson of Thomas Combs & Spann. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #101 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Scott A. Love to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Terri Leith and designating as Local Counsel Mark P. Robinson, Jr. (bm) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #98 Non-Resident Attorney William M Moreland APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Terri Leith, designating Mark P Robinson, Jr. as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #99 Non-Resident Attorney Adam D Peavy APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Terri Leith, designating Mark P Robinson, Jr. as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-00078 PSG(PVCx). (rn) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) Mail Returned addressed to Jeffrey R. Vaughan re Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail 96 (yl) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 14-03 (identical case) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. Case number now reads as 2:14-cv-7392 JGB(SPx). (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.] (Entered: 10/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 14-03 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Case transferred from Judge Margaret M. Morrow to the calendar of Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as CV 14-07392 FMO(Ex). (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.] (Entered: 09/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Scott A Love for Plaintiffs Mary Albecker, Connie Arnette, Sandra Bailey, Fran Banach, Annette Barrows, Nicole Bettin, Sally Bissell, Karin Boyer, Deline Boyse, Dorothy Breytenbach, Debbie Brock, Malissa Brown, Jacoueline Capponi, Katherine Carnahan, Doris Castilleja, Donna Clark, Peggy Clawson, Andrea Cogley, Tammy Cook, Bonnie Crawford, Linda Davis, Paula Davis, Patricia De La Fuentte, Peggy Dosch, Patricia Edenborg-Gorman, Llewelly Edwards, Darlene Endl, Nancy Esidor, Marsha Faircloth, Rosemary Flores, Jacouelyn Friend, Debra Galbraith, Rosa Graciani, Glenda Griffin, Betty Jean Hall, Debra Hammitt, Debbie Horton, Angela Howard, Sharon Iverson, Natalie Jackson, Josephine Karstetter, Barbara King, Gwendolyn Knox, Linda Kuenzli, Terri Leith, Amparo Libreros, Martha Lopez, Paula Lubinsky, Michelle Marini, Lorna Marple, Gina McSweeney, Janet Meacham, Faith Meyer, Irene Mikula, Maria Morales, Amy Moreira, Willie Morgan, Sharon Mullay, Cheryl Murphy, Susan Murzycki, Elizabeth Mustin, JoAnne Nichols, Rose Ellen Pepsin, Rebecca Peterson, Carolanne Potts, Deborah Proctor, Jeri Pryor, Jo Ann Pugh, Gloria Ramirez, Lisa Ramirez, Carol Ranson, Violet Rappuchi, Alice Revells, Georgia Rich, Jennifer Riddle, Andrea Robin, Debbie Robinson, Terenitia Rodriguez, Tina Samaniego, Beatriz Sandoval, Kimberly Schuler, Nina Schultz, Martha Serres, Janice Simons, Kandyce Singletary, Mamie Stanga, Charlotte Storms, Virdona Strube, Sheree Sweetland, Susann Thrasher, Ottie Turnmyre, Beryl Velguth, Maria White, Cathy Wilson, Daria Worley. re Notice of Removal, #1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.][Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.] (Entered: 09/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Clayton A Clark for Plaintiffs Mary Albecker, Connie Arnette, Sandra Bailey, Fran Banach, Annette Barrows, Nicole Bettin, Sally Bissell, Karin Boyer, Deline Boyse, Dorothy Breytenbach, Debbie Brock, Malissa Brown, Jacoueline Capponi, Katherine Carnahan, Doris Castilleja, Donna Clark, Peggy Clawson, Andrea Cogley, Tammy Cook, Bonnie Crawford, Linda Davis, Paula Davis, Patricia De La Fuentte, Peggy Dosch, Patricia Edenborg-Gorman, Llewelly Edwards, Darlene Endl, Nancy Esidor, Marsha Faircloth, Rosemary Flores, Jacouelyn Friend, Debra Galbraith, Rosa Graciani, Glenda Griffin, Betty Jean Hall, Debra Hammitt, Debbie Horton, Angela Howard, Sharon Iverson, Natalie Jackson, Josephine Karstetter, Barbara King, Gwendolyn Knox, Linda Kuenzli, Terri Leith, Amparo Libreros, Martha Lopez, Paula Lubinsky, Michelle Marini, Lorna Marple, Gina McSweeney, Janet Meacham, Faith Meyer, Irene Mikula, Maria Morales, Amy Moreira, Willie Morgan, Sharon Mullay, Cheryl Murphy, Susan Murzycki, Elizabeth Mustin, JoAnne Nichols, Rose Ellen Pepsin, Rebecca Peterson, Carolanne Potts, Deborah Proctor, Jeri Pryor, Jo Ann Pugh, Gloria Ramirez, Lisa Ramirez, Carol Ranson, Violet Rappuchi, Alice Revells, Georgia Rich, Jennifer Riddle, Andrea Robin, Debbie Robinson, Terenitia Rodriguez, Tina Samaniego, Beatriz Sandoval, Kimberly Schuler, Nina Schultz, Martha Serres, Janice Simons, Kandyce Singletary, Mamie Stanga, Charlotte Storms, Virdona Strube, Sheree Sweetland, Susann Thrasher, Ottie Turnmyre, Beryl Velguth, Maria White, Cathy Wilson, Daria Worley. re Notice of Removal, #1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.] (Entered: 09/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Margaret M. Morrow and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) and Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. Related Case(s): 8:14-cv-00591-JGB (SPx); 8:14-cv-00596-LGB (SPx); 2:14-cv-02916-JGB (SPx) and 2:14-cv-02915-JGB (SPx). (et) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATION AS TO Interested Parties filed by Defemdants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson, identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Ethicon Inc; Corporate Parent Ethicon PR Holdings, Corporate Parent EES Holdings de Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V. for Ethicon LLC. (et) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of JOSHUA J. WES in Support of Notice of Removal #1 filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. [STATE COURT CONFORMED FILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A.] (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2014: #1 Exhibit, #2 Part 2 to Exhibits) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of Los Angeles, case number BC536366 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint, attached to Declaration of Joshua J. Weis to Exhibit A. Case assigned to Judge Margaret M. Morrow, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (Filing fee $400 PAID.), filed by Defendants Ethicon LLC, Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2014: #1 Exhibit, #2 Part 2 of Exhibits) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam D. Peavy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua J Wes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kari L Sutherland