This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2021 at 09:31:01 (UTC).

Terrence James Allen v. City Hall

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 Terrence James Allen filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City Hall. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia A. Phillips and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01740

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terrence James Allen

Anaheim, CA 92806

Defendant

City Hall

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting #4 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.1.1, the applicant must register to use the Court's CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Court's website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (hr) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Complaint #1 . The Court DISMISSES the complaint with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have 30 days after entry of this order to file a First Amended Complaint. (see document for further details) (hr) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Complaint #1 . The Court DISMISSES the complaint with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have 30 days after entry of this order to file a First Amended Complaint. (see document for further details) (hr) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting #4 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.1.1, the applicant must register to use the Court's CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Court's website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (hr) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case, filed by Plaintiff Terrence James Allen. (lh) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Terrence James Allen. (lh) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Terrence James Allen, (lh) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Defendant City Hall. Case assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Filed by Plaintiff Terrence James Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Request) (lh) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY HALL is a litigant