This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/05/2021 at 11:31:08 (UTC).

Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government v. United States Department of Transportation et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against United States Department of Transportation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah S. Vance and Donna Phillips Currault. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00701

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah S. Vance

Referral Judge

Donna Phillips Currault

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government President

Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government

Defendants

United States Department of Transportation

Federal Highway Administration

Federal Highway Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian John Marceaux

Attorney at Hebert & Marceaux, LLC

4752 Hwy, 311, Suite 114

Houma, LA 70360

Courtney Elizabeth Alcock

Attorney at Law Office of Courtney E. Alcock

209 Goode Street, Suite 301

Houma, LA 70360

Patrick H. Yancey

Attorney at Law Office of Patrick H. Yancey, APLC

761 West Tunnel Blvd., Suite C

Houma, LA 70360

Julius P. Hebert, Jr.

Attorney at Hebert & Marceaux

4752 Hwy. 311, Suite 114

Houma, LA 70360

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Federal Highway Administration through Charles Bolinger served on 4/29/2021, answer due 6/28/2021 (Marceaux, Brian) Modified text on 5/3/2021 (mm). (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Federal Highway Administration served on 4/29/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Marceaux, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed; United States Department of Transportation served on 4/29/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Marceaux, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

10 #6

Summons

10 #5

Summons

10 #4

Summons

10 #3

Summons

10 #2

Summons

10 #1

Summons

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to Federal Highway Administration, United States Department of Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(bm) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#9

(#9) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Marceaux, Brian) (Main Document 9 replaced on 4/27/2021) (bm). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#8

(#8) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Marceaux, Brian) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/27/2021) (bm). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Marceaux, Brian) (Main Document 7 replaced on 4/27/2021) (bm). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Marceaux, Brian) (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/27/2021) (bm). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Marceaux, Brian) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/27/2021) (bm). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Marceaux, Brian) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/27/2021) (bm). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Marceaux, Brian) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/27/2021) (bm). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

1 #13

Civil Cover Sheet

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Federal Highway Administration through Charles Bolinger served on 4/29/2021, answer due 6/28/2021 (Marceaux, Brian) Modified text on 5/3/2021 (mm). (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Federal Highway Administration served on 4/29/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Marceaux, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed; United States Department of Transportation served on 4/29/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Marceaux, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Summons Submitted for Issuance, #6 Summons Submitted for Issuance, #5 Summons Submitted for Issuance, #3 Summons Submitted for Issuance, #8 Summons Submitted for Issuance, #9 Summons Submitted for Issuance, #4 Summons Submitted for Issuance. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should not have the the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (bm) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Federal Highway Administration, United States Department of Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(bm) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Marceaux, Brian) (Main Document 9 replaced on 4/27/2021) (bm). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Marceaux, Brian) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/27/2021) (bm). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Marceaux, Brian) (Main Document 7 replaced on 4/27/2021) (bm). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Marceaux, Brian) (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/27/2021) (bm). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Marceaux, Brian) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/27/2021) (bm). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Marceaux, Brian) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/27/2021) (bm). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Marceaux, Brian) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/27/2021) (bm). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8803857) filed by Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government President. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Brian John Marceaux added to party Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government President(pty:pla).(Marceaux, Brian) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government Medical Staff is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Highway Administration is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick H. Yancey(Designation Retained)