This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/05/2022 at 09:15:32 (UTC).

Terranova v. SAFECO Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 Terranova filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SAFECO Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel D. Domenico. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03286

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Domenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vincent Terranova

Defendant

SAFECO Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Edward Bukowski

Attorney at Merlin Law Group-Denver

1001 17Th Street, Suite 1150

Denver, CO 80202

Larry E. Bache, Jr.

Attorney at Merlin Law Group

777 S. Harbour Island Blvd., Suite 950

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

Holly C. White

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

1601 19Th Street,, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

Jon Milton Ludwig

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

1601 19Th Street,, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

Brian John Spano

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

1601 19Th Street,, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Vincent Terranova All parties do not consent.. (Bukowski, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jon Milton Ludwig on behalf of SAFECO Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Jon Milton Ludwig added to party SAFECO Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Ludwig, Jon) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #6 Complaint by SAFECO Insurance Company of America.(Spano, Brian) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Holly C. White on behalf of SAFECO Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Holly C. White added to party SAFECO Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (White, Holly) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Edward Bukowski on behalf of Vincent TerranovaAttorney Jonathan Edward Bukowski added to party Vincent Terranova(pty:pla) (Bukowski, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#8

(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, ) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint upon Safeco Insurance Company on 11/17/2021 (norlin, ) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#6

(#6) COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against SAFECO Insurance Company of America, filed by Vincent Terranova.(norlin, ) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Larry E. Bache, Jr on behalf of Vincent TerranovaAttorney Larry E. Bache, Jr added to party Vincent Terranova(pty:pla) (Bache, Larry) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

2 #6

Summons

2 #5

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2 #4

Complaint with Jury Demand

2 #3

Civil Procedure Order

2 #2

Affidavit of Service

2 #1

Docket Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

1 #5

Exhibit E - State Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Return of Service

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Vincent Terranova All parties do not consent.. (Bukowski, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jon Milton Ludwig on behalf of SAFECO Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Jon Milton Ludwig added to party SAFECO Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Ludwig, Jon) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #6 Complaint by SAFECO Insurance Company of America.(Spano, Brian) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Holly C. White on behalf of SAFECO Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Holly C. White added to party SAFECO Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (White, Holly) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Edward Bukowski on behalf of Vincent TerranovaAttorney Jonathan Edward Bukowski added to party Vincent Terranova(pty:pla) (Bukowski, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, ) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint upon Safeco Insurance Company on 11/17/2021 (norlin, ) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against SAFECO Insurance Company of America, filed by Vincent Terranova.(norlin, ) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Larry E. Bache, Jr on behalf of Vincent TerranovaAttorney Larry E. Bache, Jr added to party Vincent Terranova(pty:pla) (Bache, Larry) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, ) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant SAFECO Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Civil Procedure Order, #4 Complaint with Jury Demand, #5 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Spano, Brian) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SAFECO Insurance Company of America from Jefferson County District Court, Case Number 21cv31262. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8213098), filed by SAFECO Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Notice to Counsel of Filing, #5 Exhibit E - State Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spano, Brian) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon M. Ludwig

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Holly C. White

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian John Spano