This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/20/2022 at 08:21:13 (UTC).

Terra Libre Land Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 Terra Libre Land Trust filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank NA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is James L. Robart. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-05277

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James L. Robart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terra Libre Land Trust

3965 Bethel Rd Se

Port Orchard, WA 98366

Defendants

Wells Fargo Bank NA

National Asset Management Group

JG Wentworth Home Lending LLC

Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington

Kitsap County Corporation

Orange Coast Title Company

Solidifi Title Agency Inc

Wells Fargo Home Mortgage

Secretary of Veteran Affairs

Department of Veteran Affairs

Fidelity National Title Insurance Company

McCalla Raymer Liebert Pierce

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

*Restricted*

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Redaction.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (cc: plaintiff w/copies of exhibit pages 46, 47 via USPS) (ST) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: TLLT is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11(a). Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) (cc: Plaintiff via US mail) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#5

(#5) REDACTION to Exhibit 1 to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Terra Libre Land Trust (LH) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: TLLT has neither responded to the court's show cause order nor cured the deficiencies identified therein. Accordingly, the court DISMISSES this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this order to TLLT. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) (cc: Plaintiff via US mail) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: TLLT has neither responded to the court's show cause order nor cured the deficiencies identified therein. Accordingly, the court DISMISSES this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this order to TLLT. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) (cc: Plaintiff via US mail) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REDACTION to Exhibit 1 to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Terra Libre Land Trust (LH) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: TLLT is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11(a). Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) (cc: Plaintiff via US mail) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Redaction.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (cc: plaintiff w/copies of exhibit pages 46, 47 via USPS) (ST) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement, if applicable, by 4/29/2022. (cc: plaintiff w/copy of docket report via USPS) (ST) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James L. Robart. (ST) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Terra Libre Land Trust against defendant(s) Department of Veteran Affairs, Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, JG Wentworth Home Lending LLC, Kitsap County Corporation, McCalla Raymer Liebert Pierce, National Asset Management Group, Orange Coast Title Company, Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington, Secretary of Veteran Affairs, Solidifi Title Agency Inc, Wells Fargo Bank NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage with JURY DEMAND (Summons(es) not issued) (Receipt # TAC016977) (Attachments: SEALED#1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ST) Modified on 4/22/2022. Exhibit(s) sealed as they include personal identifiers. (ST) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JG WENTWORTH HOME LENDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Kitsap County is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE is a litigant