This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2021 at 09:50:10 (UTC).

Terpening v. Amazon.com Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Terpening filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Amazon com Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ricardo S. Martinez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00977

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ricardo S. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Terpening

Defendants

Amazon.com Inc

Does 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Brian Charles Gudmundson

PRO HAC VICE PENDING

555 California Street, Floor 12

San Francisco, CA 94104

Caleb L Marker

Attorney at ZIMMERMAN REED LLP (CA)

2381 Rosecrans Ave Ste 328

Manhattan Beach, CA 90245

Jason P Johnston

Michael James Laird

Jedediah Wakefield

Attorney at FENWICK & WEST (SF)

555 California St, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Laurence F. Pulgram

Attorney at FENWICK & WEST (SF)

555 California St, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Brian D Buckley

Attorney at FENWICK & WEST (WA)

1191 Second Ave, 10Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101

Esther D. Galan

 

Court Documents

#38

#37

#36

#35

#32

#31

#30

8 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#8

7 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#7

6 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated per Plaintiff's #38 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. (PM) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff David Terpening (Marker, Caleb) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE re Garner et al. v. Amazon.com, Inc., Case No. 2:21-cv-00750 RSL ; filed by Defendant Amazon.com Inc. (Buckley, Brian) Modified on 7/29/2021 to add related case name and number (PM). (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Caleb L Marker on behalf of Plaintiff David Terpening. (Marker, Caleb) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amazon.com Inc (Buckley, Brian) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER re #32 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jedediah Wakefield for Defendant Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER re #31 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Laurence F. Pulgram for Defendant Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jedediah Wakefield FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7177124 (Buckley, Brian) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Laurence F. Pulgram FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7177062 (Buckley, Brian) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian D Buckley on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com Inc. (Buckley, Brian) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/21/2021.] (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Terpening.. (Marker, Caleb) (Filed on 6/1/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/21/2021.] (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16012287.) filed by David Terpening. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Laird, Michael) (Filed on 5/26/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/21/2021.] (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16010837.) filed by David Terpening. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gudmundson, Brian) (Filed on 5/26/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/21/2021.] (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16010809.) filed by David Terpening. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Johnston, Jason) (Filed on 5/26/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/21/2021.] (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Amazon.com, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/21/2021.] (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/21/2021.] (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/2/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/21/2021.] (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Marker, Caleb) (Filed on 5/18/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/21/2021.] (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Amazon.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15982407.). Filed byDavid Terpening. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marker, Caleb) (Filed on 5/18/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/21/2021.] (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian D. Buckley