This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 08:38:58 (UTC).

Tereault v. Saul

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Tereault filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine M. Menendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-01599

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Troy Fremont Tereault

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James H Greeman

Attorney at Greeman Toomey

250 Marquette Ave Ste 1380

Mpls, MN 55401

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/21/2020. (KAT) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (MMP) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/21/2020. (KAT) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (MMG) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez per Social Security List. Please use case number 20-cv-1599 KMM. (MMG) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Troy Fremont Tereault. (Greeman, James) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Troy Fremont Tereault. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Greeman, James) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less