This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2020 at 08:12:50 (UTC).

Tenzer-Fuchs v. BMG Rights Management (US) LLC

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Tenzer-Fuchs filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against BMG Rights Management US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sandra J. Feuerstein and Arlene R. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04384

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sandra J. Feuerstein

Referral Judge

Arlene R. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michelle Tenzer-Fuchs

Defendant

BMG Rights Management (US) LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Shalom

Attorney at Shalom Law, PLLC

105-13 Metropolitan Avenue

Forest Hills, NY 11375

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph J. Lynett

Attorney at Jackson Lewis LLP

44 South Broadway, 14Th Floor

White Plains, NY 10601

Rebecca Marie McCloskey

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

44 South Broadway

White Plains, NY 10601

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BMG Rights Management (US) LLC. (McCloskey, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BMG Rights Management (US) LLC. (McCloskey, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Marie McCloskey on behalf of BMG Rights Management (US) LLC (aty to be noticed) (McCloskey, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Lynett on behalf of BMG Rights Management (US) LLC (aty to be noticed) (Lynett, Joseph) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Tenzer-Fuchs. BMG Rights Management (US) LLC served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Shalom, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to BMG Rights Management (US) LLC. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Michelle Tenzer-Fuchs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shalom, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BMG Rights Management (US) LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13384837 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Michelle Tenzer-Fuchs. (Shalom, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BMG Rights Management (US) LLC. (McCloskey, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BMG Rights Management (US) LLC. (McCloskey, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Marie McCloskey on behalf of BMG Rights Management (US) LLC (aty to be noticed) (McCloskey, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Lynett on behalf of BMG Rights Management (US) LLC (aty to be noticed) (Lynett, Joseph) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Tenzer-Fuchs. BMG Rights Management (US) LLC served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Shalom, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/4/2021 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court.Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 9/21/2020. (Disbrow, Sandra) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to BMG Rights Management (US) LLC. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Michelle Tenzer-Fuchs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shalom, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BMG Rights Management (US) LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13384837 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Michelle Tenzer-Fuchs. (Shalom, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMG Rights Management (UK) Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Shalom