This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/24/2022 at 07:00:24 (UTC).

Tenzer-Fuchs v. Sally Beauty Supply, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/25/2021 Tenzer-Fuchs filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Sally Beauty Supply, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Arlene R. Lindsay and Diane Gujarati. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-06607

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Arlene R. Lindsay

Presiding Judge

Diane Gujarati

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Michelle Tenzer-Fuchs

Sally Beauty Supply, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Shalom

Attorney at Shalom Law, PLLC

105-13 Metropolitan Avenue

Forest Hills, NY 11375

Defendant Attorneys

Robert J Thorpe

Attorney at Barclay Damon, LLP

125 East Jefferson Street

Syracuse, NY 13202

Ross Michael Greenky

Attorney at Barclay Damon LLP

125 East Jefferson Street

Syracuse, NY 13202

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Sally Beauty Supply, LLC. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Tenzer-Fuchs. Sally Beauty Supply, LLC served on 12/14/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Shalom, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J Thorpe on behalf of Sally Beauty Supply, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Thorpe, Robert) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION for extension of deadline to respond to the complaint by Sally Beauty Supply, LLC (Thorpe, Robert) Modified on 1/5/2022 (Imrie, Robert). (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Ross Michael Greenky on behalf of Sally Beauty Supply, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Greenky, Ross) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sally Beauty Supply, LLC. (Greenky, Ross) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sally Beauty Supply, LLC. (Greenky, Ross) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Ross Michael Greenky on behalf of Sally Beauty Supply, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Greenky, Ross) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER re #7 : The time for Sally Beauty Supply, LLC to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including January 18, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 1/5/2022. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION for extension of deadline to respond to the complaint by Sally Beauty Supply, LLC (Thorpe, Robert) Modified on 1/5/2022 (Imrie, Robert). (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J Thorpe on behalf of Sally Beauty Supply, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Thorpe, Robert) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Tenzer-Fuchs. Sally Beauty Supply, LLC served on 12/14/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Shalom, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Sally Beauty Supply, LLC. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sally Beauty Supply, LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15063068 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Michelle Tenzer-Fuchs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Shalom, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sally Beauty Supply LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert J. Thorpe(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ross Michael Greenky