This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/01/2023 at 15:17:45 (UTC).

Tensai v. BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 Tensai filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00443

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Surafel Tensai

Defendant

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin Y. Jacobson

Defendant Attorney

Madeleine Messinger

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC.. (Messinger, Madeleine) (Filed on 3/16/2023) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

#14

(#14) SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/29/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2023) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

#13

(#13) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Surafel Tensai.. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Filed on 3/7/2023) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

#12

(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/14/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2023) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Madeleine Messinger (Messinger, Madeleine) (Filed on 2/24/2023) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC and Certification of Interested Parties Pursuant to CP 7.1 (Messinger, Madeleine) (Filed on 2/24/2023) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

9 #2

Notice of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure

9 #1

Notice of Apperance

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint byBMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Apperance, #2 Notice of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure)(Messinger, Madeleine) (Filed on 2/23/2023) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Surafel Tensai.. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Filed on 2/23/2023) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#7

(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/2/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Surafel Tensai (Jacobson, Kevin) (Filed on 2/3/2023) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2023) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2023) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Filed on 1/31/2023) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC.. (Messinger, Madeleine) (Filed on 3/16/2023) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/29/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2023) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Document filed in wrong case. by Joshua Kohanoff ??? [err401] Re: #13 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Surafel Tensai (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2023) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Surafel Tensai.. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Filed on 3/7/2023) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/14/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2023) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Madeleine Messinger (Messinger, Madeleine) (Filed on 2/24/2023) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC and Certification of Interested Parties Pursuant to CP 7.1 (Messinger, Madeleine) (Filed on 2/24/2023) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]*** The attorney coming INTO the case should e-file a Notice of Appearance separately NOT attached to answer.*** This will add the attorney to the case immediately.***ALSO the certification of interested parties should be filed separately NOT attached to answer. Re: #9 Answer to Complaint filed by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2023) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint byBMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Apperance, #2 Notice of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure)(Messinger, Madeleine) (Filed on 2/23/2023) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Surafel Tensai.. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Filed on 2/23/2023) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/2/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Surafel Tensai (Jacobson, Kevin) (Filed on 2/3/2023) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2023) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2023) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/14/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2023) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Filed on 1/31/2023) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17944708.). Filed bySurafel Tensai. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jacobson, Kevin) (Filed on 1/31/2023) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less