This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/01/2021 at 09:58:02 (UTC).

Tennessee Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People et al v. Lee et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 Tennessee Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Lee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffery S. Frensley and William L. Campbell, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01039

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jeffery S. Frensley

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Curtis Gray Jr

Tennessee Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People

Lamar Perry

Benjamin Tournier

Amanda Lee Martin

John Weare

Defendants

William Lee

Melissa Harrell

Tony C. Parker

Tre Hargett

Mark Goins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles K. Grant

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC (Nash)

211 Commerce Street, Suite 800

Nashville, TN 37201

Phil Telfeyan

Attorney at Equal Justice Under Law

400 7Th St. Nw, Suite 602

Washington, DC 20004

Natasha Baker

Attorney at Equal Justice Under Law

400 7Th St. Nw, Suite 602

Washington, DC 20004

Aseem Mulji

Attorney at Campaign Legal Center

1101 14Th Street Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20005

Danielle Lang

Attorney at Campaign Legal Center

1101 14Th Street Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20005

Keeda Haynes

Attorney at Free Hearts

2013 25Th Ave. N

Nashville, TN 37208

Mark P. Gaber

Attorney at Campaign Legal Center

1101 14Th Street Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20005

Denmark J. Grant

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC (Nash)

211 Commerce Street, Suite 800

Nashville, TN 37201

Defendant Attorneys

Janet M. Kleinfelter

Tennessee Attorney General'S Office, P O Box 20207

Nashville, TN 37202-0207

Nicholas Clinton Christiansen

Attorney at Hudson, Reed & Christiansen, PLLC

16 Public Square, N

Murfreesboro, TN 37130

 

Court Documents

#32

#31

#30

29 #2

Exhibit B - 1/27/2021 letter

29 #1

Exhibit A - 8/22/2018 letter

#29

#28

#27

#24

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Federal form for TN Voter Registration Application

1 #2

Exhibit B - TN Mail-In App for Voter Registration

1 #1

Exhibit A - COR form

#1

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/28/2021. (mg) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Curtis Gray Jr, Amanda Lee Martin, Lamar Perry, Tennessee Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Benjamin Tournier, John Weare re #29 Response in Opposition to Motion, #30 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Grant, Charles) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#29 , #30 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (mg) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Curtis Gray Jr, Amanda Lee Martin, Lamar Perry, Tennessee Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Benjamin Tournier, John Weare. (Grant, Charles) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Curtis Gray Jr, Amanda Lee Martin, Lamar Perry, Tennessee Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Benjamin Tournier, John Weare. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 8/22/2018 letter, #2 Exhibit B - 1/27/2021 letter)(Grant, Charles) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #24 MOTION to Dismiss. The Court extends Plaintiffs' response deadline by two weeks to January 27, 2021. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/8/2021. (mg) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss by Curtis Gray Jr, Amanda Lee Martin, Lamar Perry, Tennessee Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Benjamin Tournier, John Weare. (Grant, Charles) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Nicholas Clinton Christiansen admitted to this court. (mg) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER: #25 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is GRANTED. Counsel is advised to comply with Local Rule 7.01(a)(1) in the future. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/31/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Mark Goins, Tre Hargett, William Lee. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exh. 1 to Memorandum)(Kleinfelter, Janet) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for attorney Danielle M. Lang to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3269444) by Curtis Gray Jr, Amanda Lee Martin, Lamar Perry, Tennessee Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Benjamin Tournier, John Weare. (Grant, Charles) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for attorney Aseem B. Mulji to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3269292) by Curtis Gray Jr, Amanda Lee Martin, Lamar Perry, Tennessee Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Benjamin Tournier, John Weare. (Grant, Charles) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons issued as to Mark Goins, Tre Hargett, Melissa Harrell, William Lee, Tony C. Parker. Service copies will be returned to counsel (Charles Grant) by mail. (mg) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL Danielle Lang, Mark P. Gaber, Aseem Mulji, Phil Telfeyan, Natasha Baker: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/24/2020. (mg) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketD.C. Bar status verified as active for Danielle Lang, Mark P. Gaber, Phil Telfeyan, Natasha Baker not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL Keeda Haynes: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 12/24/2020. (mg) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Charles K. Grant, Denmark J. Grant, Keeda Haynes admitted to this court. (mg) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mark Goins, Tre Hargett, Melissa Harrell, William Lee, Tony C. Parker (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3268462), filed by John Weare, Tennessee Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Amanda Lee Martin, Benjamin Tournier, Curtis Gray Jr, Lamar Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - COR form, #2 Exhibit B - TN Mail-In App for Voter Registration, #3 Exhibit C - Federal form for TN Voter Registration Application, #4 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles K Grant(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phil Telfeyan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANIELLE MARIE LANG

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARK P GABER