This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/27/2022 at 08:16:33 (UTC).

Tenet Hospitals Limited dba The Hospitals of Providence v. Occupational Safety & Health Administration et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 Tenet Hospitals Limited dba The Hospitals of Providence filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Occupational Safety Health Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathleen Cardone. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00149

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen Cardone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tenet Hospitals Limited doing business as The Hospitals of Providence

Defendants

Occupational Safety & Health Administration

Marty J. Walsh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Franklin Dalton Davis, III

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC

8117 Preston Road, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

Jeff T. Leslie

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

8117 Preston Road, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

Patrick J. Maher

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak, & Stewart, P.C.

8117 Preston Road, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

Defendant Attorney

Eduardo R. Castillo

Attorney at Assistant United States Attorney

700 East San Antonio

El Paso, TX 79901

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tenet Hospitals Limited (Leslie, Jeff) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Related Cases by Tenet Hospitals Limited (Maher, Patrick) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#7

(#7) ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Occupational Safety & Health Administration, Marty J. Walsh . (Castillo, Eduardo) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Occupational Safety & Health Administration, Marty J. Walsh, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dc) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER DENYING #3 Motion for TRO. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall APPEAR for a for a preliminary injunction hearing on Monday, May 9, 2022, at 1:00 PM and Plaintiff shall SERVE Defendants Occupational Health and Safety Administration and Marty J. Walsh by no later than May 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by Tenet Hospitals Limited dba The Hospitals of Providene. (Davis, Franklin) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

3 #9

Proposed Order

3 #8

Exhibit 2E

3 #7

Exhibit 2D

3 #6

Exhibit 2C

3 #5

Exhibit 2B

3 #4

Exhibit 2A

3 #3

Exhibit 2

3 #2

Exhibit 1

3 #1

Appendix

#3

(#3) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Tenet Hospitals Limited dba The Hospitals of Providene. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 2A, #5 Exhibit 2B, #6 Exhibit 2C, #7 Exhibit 2D, #8 Exhibit 2E, #9 Proposed Order)(Davis, Franklin) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Tenet Hospitals Limited dba The Hospitals of Providene. (Davis, Franklin) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tenet Hospitals Limited (Leslie, Jeff) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Related Cases by Tenet Hospitals Limited (Maher, Patrick) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Occupational Safety & Health Administration, Marty J. Walsh . (Castillo, Eduardo) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketSet Hearings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 5/9/2022 01:00 PM before Judge Kathleen Cardone, (dc) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Occupational Safety & Health Administration, Marty J. Walsh, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dc) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER DENYING #3 Motion for TRO. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall APPEAR for a for a preliminary injunction hearing on Monday, May 9, 2022, at 1:00 PM and Plaintiff shall SERVE Defendants Occupational Health and Safety Administration and Marty J. Walsh by no later than May 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (dc) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Kathleen Cardone. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dc) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by Tenet Hospitals Limited dba The Hospitals of Providene. (Davis, Franklin) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Tenet Hospitals Limited dba The Hospitals of Providene. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 2A, #5 Exhibit 2B, #6 Exhibit 2C, #7 Exhibit 2D, #8 Exhibit 2E, #9 Proposed Order)(Davis, Franklin) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Tenet Hospitals Limited dba The Hospitals of Providene. (Davis, Franklin) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15976851), filed by Tenet Hospitals Limited dba The Hospitals of Providene. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2A, #4 Exhibit 2B, #5 Exhibit 2C, #6 Exhibit 2D, #7 Exhibit 2E, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Franklin) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3M COMPANY OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eduardo R. Castillo