This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2022 at 07:47:02 (UTC).

Temple View Capital Funding I, LLC v. First American Title Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 Temple View Capital Funding I, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against First American Title Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul D. Borman and David R. Grand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-12615

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul D. Borman

Referral Judge

David R. Grand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Temple View Capital Funding I, LLC

Defendants

First American Title Insurance Company

Speedy Title & Escrow Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donald S. Maurice, Jr.

Attorney at MauriceWutscher LLP

5 Walter E. Foran Blvd.Suite 2007

Flemington, NJ 08822

Bradley S. Defoe

Attorney at Varnum, Riddering, Schmidt & Howlett

39500 High Pointe Blvd.Suite 350

Novi, MI 48375

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Issued for *Speedy Title & Escrow Services, LLC* (NAhm) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Issued for *First American Title Insurance Company* (NAhm) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Correction re #8 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. (NAhm) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#8

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley S. Defoe on behalf of Temple View Capital Funding I, LLC. (Defoe, Bradley) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

6 #18

Exhibit Exhibit 17 - February 9, 2021 Correspondence Disputing Appraisal Amount

6 #17

Exhibit Exhibit 16 - January 16, 2021 Appraisal

6 #16

Exhibit Exhibit 15 - January 19, 2019 Appraisal

6 #15

Exhibit Exhibit 14 - January 28, 2021 Acknowledgment Letter from FATIC

6 #14

Exhibit Exhibit 13 - January 5, 2021 Coverage Letter from FATIC

6 #12

Exhibit Exhibit 11 - December 22, 2020 Claim Acknowledgment Letter

6 #11

Exhibit Exhibit 10 - December 15, 2020 Claim to FATIC

6 #10

Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Counterclaim Filed by Detroit Land Bank Authority

6 #9

Exhibit Exhibit 8 - May 28, 2020 Claim Denial Letter

6 #8

Exhibit Exhibit 7 - March 16, 2020 Claim Acknowledgment Letter

6 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Written Closing Instructions Issued to Speedy Title

6 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Closing Protection Letter from FATIC

6 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Purchase Agreement Between Detroit Land Bank and Detroit Pro

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Issued for *Speedy Title & Escrow Services, LLC* (NAhm) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Issued for *First American Title Insurance Company* (NAhm) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Correction re #8 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. (NAhm) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) [STRICKEN] Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 11/24/2021 (NAhm) Modified on 11/17/2021 (NAhm). (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley S. Defoe on behalf of Temple View Capital Funding I, LLC. (Defoe, Bradley) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. County of 1st Plaintiff: Montgomery County - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County - County of 1st Defendant: Orange County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Purchase Agreement Between Detroit Land Bank and Detroit Property Giants, LLC, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Loan Policy of Title Insurance issued by FATIC, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Closing Protection Letter from FATIC, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Written Closing Instructions Issued to Speedy Title, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Mortgage, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - March 9, 2020 Claim to FATIC, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - March 16, 2020 Claim Acknowledgment Letter, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - May 28, 2020 Claim Denial Letter, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Counterclaim Filed by Detroit Land Bank Authority, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - December 15, 2020 Claim to FATIC, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - December 22, 2020 Claim Acknowledgment Letter, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - December 22, 2020 Correspondence between TVC and FATIC, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - January 5, 2021 Coverage Letter from FATIC, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - January 28, 2021 Acknowledgment Letter from FATIC, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - January 19, 2019 Appraisal, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - January 16, 2021 Appraisal, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - February 9, 2021 Correspondence Disputing Appraisal Amount) (Maurice, Donald) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REQUIRING TEMPLE VIEW CAPITAL FUNDING I, LLC TO DISCLOSE ITS INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SECURE LOCAL COUNSEL. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER to STRIKE and REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO RE-FILE 2 Complaint, filed by Temple View Capital Funding I, LLC. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8682533 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Montgomery County - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County - County of 1st Defendant: Orange County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Maurice, Donald) Modified on 11/8/2021 (TTho). [PER ATTORNEY PHONE CALL COMPLAINT NOT ATTACHED, WILL REFILE COMPLAINT] (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEMPLE VIEW CAPITAL FUNDING LP is a litigant

Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald S. Maurice Esq. Jr.