This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2021 at 08:01:53 (UTC).

Temple v. Wesco Insurance Co et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 Temple filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Wesco Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claria Horn Boom and Greg N. Stivers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00604

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Claria Horn Boom

Greg N. Stivers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Temple, Jr.

Savannah, GA 31406

Defendants

Wesco Insurance Co

Amtrust - Insurance Co

Progressive Insurance

Travelers Insurance

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/28/21 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Judge Claria Horn Boom RECUSES from this matter, and the action is hereby REASSIGNED to the docket of Judge Gregory N. Stivers for all further proceedings. Counsel are requested to change the civil action number to reflect the initials GNS on all further pleadings. cc: Plaintiff(pro se), CM-GNS (DJT) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#5

(#5) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (DJT) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 11/16/2021. Within 30 days from the entry date of this Order, Plaintiff shall 1) either pay the $402 filing fee for this action or file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees; and 2) file a completed summons form for each Defendant. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a non-prisoner application to proceed without prepayment of fees with this case number along with four blank summons forms.cc:Plaintiff, pro se (Forms enclosed) (JWM) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 11/16/2021. Within 30 days from the entry date of this Order, Plaintiff shall 1) either pay the $402 filing fee for this action or file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees; and 2) file a completed summons form for each Defendant. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a non-prisoner application to proceed without prepayment of fees with this case number along with four blank summons forms.cc:Plaintiff, pro se (Forms enclosed) (JWM) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (DJT) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/28/21 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Judge Claria Horn Boom RECUSES from this matter, and the action is hereby REASSIGNED to the docket of Judge Gregory N. Stivers for all further proceedings. Counsel are requested to change the civil action number to reflect the initials GNS on all further pleadings. cc: Plaintiff(pro se), CM-GNS (DJT) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: Filin Fee not paid nor IFP Motion Filed. Summons not tendered. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 10/27/2021. (DJT) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DJT) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Amtrust - Insurance Co, Progressive Insurance, Travelers Insurance, Wesco Insurance Co, filed by James Temple, Jr.. (DJT) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amtrust Insurance Company of Kansas is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant