Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/02/2021 at 09:03:14 (UTC).

Temple v. United States

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 Temple filed a Property - Land lawsuit against United States. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L. Viken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-05065

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey L. Viken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Curtis Temple

Defendant

United States

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Terry L. Pechota

Attorney at Pechota Law Office

1617 Sheridan Lake Rd.

Rapid City, SD 57702

Defendant Attorney

Delia M. Druley (USA)

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Sioux Falls, SD)

Po Box 2638

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-2638

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadlines by United States. (Druley (USA), Delia) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Delia M. Druley (USA) on behalf of United States. (Druley (USA), Delia) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

3 #2

AO 85

3 #1

Summons Issued

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(DLC) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Curtis Temple. (Pechota, Terry) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, $400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3422472, in shell case on 11/3/2020 filed by Curtis Temple. (SLT) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Deadline. The government's answer shall be filed by 2/16/21. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 12/21/20. (SB) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadlines by United States. (Druley (USA), Delia) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Delia M. Druley (USA) on behalf of United States. (Druley (USA), Delia) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(DLC) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Curtis Temple. (Pechota, Terry) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, $400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3422472, in shell case on 11/3/2020 filed by Curtis Temple. (SLT) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terry L. Pechota