Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2020 at 07:16:33 (UTC).

TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. v. AZAR II et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against AZAR II. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04533

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.

Defendants

SEEMA VERMA

ALEX M. AZAR, II

ROBERT G EATON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH DAVID GLAZER

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF JOSEPH D. GLAZER, P.C.

116 Village Boulevard, Suite 200

Princeton, NJ 08540

Defendant Attorney

LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

615 Chestnut Street, Suite 1250

Philadelphia, PA 19106

 

Court Documents

10 #3

Certificate of Service

10 #2

Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Statement of Undispted Material F

10 #1

Declaration Joseph D. Glazer

#10

(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joseph D. Glazer, #2 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Statement of Undispted Material Facts, #3 Certificate of Service)(GLAZER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

9 #1

Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts

#9

(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROBERT G EATON, SEEMA VERMA. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts)(DEBRUICKER, LAUREN) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

8 #6

Exhibit Glazer Declaration 1-2

8 #5

Declaration Joseph Glazer

8 #4

Exhibit Young Declaration 6

8 #3

Exhibit Young Declaration 1-5

8 #2

Declaration Michael Young

8 #1

Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts

#8

(#8) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. Brief, Statement of undisputed Facts, Declarations, Exhibits. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Declaration Michael Young, #3 Exhibit Young Declaration 1-5, #4 Exhibit Young Declaration 6, #5 Declaration Joseph Glazer, #6 Exhibit Glazer Declaration 1-2)(GLAZER, JOSEPH) Modified on 10/19/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

7 #1

Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts

#7

(#7) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROBERT G EATON, SEEMA VERMA.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts)(DEBRUICKER, LAUREN) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDERED THAT THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS IN THIS MATTER SHALL BE AS FOLLOWS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/1/20. 10/1/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROBERT G EATON, SEEMA VERMA with Certificate of Service(DEBRUICKER, LAUREN) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#4

(#4) 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joseph D. Glazer, #2 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Statement of Undispted Material Facts, #3 Certificate of Service)(GLAZER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROBERT G EATON, SEEMA VERMA. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts)(DEBRUICKER, LAUREN) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. Brief, Statement of undisputed Facts, Declarations, Exhibits. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Declaration Michael Young, #3 Exhibit Young Declaration 1-5, #4 Exhibit Young Declaration 6, #5 Declaration Joseph Glazer, #6 Exhibit Glazer Declaration 1-2)(GLAZER, JOSEPH) Modified on 10/19/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROBERT G EATON, SEEMA VERMA.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts)(DEBRUICKER, LAUREN) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDERED THAT THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS IN THIS MATTER SHALL BE AS FOLLOWS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/1/20. 10/1/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROBERT G EATON, SEEMA VERMA with Certificate of Service(DEBRUICKER, LAUREN) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (rf, ) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROBERT G EATON, SEEMA VERMA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/18/2020 (bw, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC..(GLAZER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROBERT G EATON, SEEMA VERMA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14568606.), filed by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(GLAZER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL-EPISCOPAL CAMPUS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER