Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2019 at 08:25:14 (UTC).

Telecommunications Systems, Inc. v. Coggeshall

Case Summary

On 08/16/2019 Telecommunications Systems, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Coggeshall. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ellen L. Hollander. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02369

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ellen L. Hollander

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Telecommunications Systems, Inc.

Defendant

Douglas A Coggeshall

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donald Eugene English, Jr

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

2800 Quarry Lake Drive, Suite 200

Baltimore, MD 21209

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Telecommunications Systems, Inc.. Douglas A Coggeshall served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019.(English, Donald) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Telecommunications Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Comtech Telecommunications Corp. for Telecommunications Systems, Inc..(English, Donald) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Douglas A Coggeshall.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Douglas A Coggeshall ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8183358.), filed by Telecommunications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(English, Donald) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Telecommunications Systems, Inc.. Douglas A Coggeshall served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019.(English, Donald) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Telecommunications Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Comtech Telecommunications Corp. for Telecommunications Systems, Inc..(English, Donald) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Douglas A Coggeshall.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Deficiency Notice as to Telecommunication Systems, Inc-- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 8/26/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Douglas A Coggeshall ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8183358.), filed by Telecommunications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(English, Donald) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Telecommunication Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald Eugene English, Jr