This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/23/2019 at 08:44:43 (UTC).

Telebrands Corp. v. Altair Instruments, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 Telebrands Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Altair Instruments, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jean P. Rosenbluth, Christina A. Snyder and Andre Birotte Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-09158

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

Presiding Judges

Christina A. Snyder

Andre Birotte Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Telebrands Corp

Defendant

Altair Instruments Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Katelyn O'Reilly

Attorney at Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP

Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street 15Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

Liza M Walsh

Attorney at Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP

Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street 15Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

Tonia A Sayour

Attorney at Cooper and Dunham LLP

30 Rockefeller Plaza 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10112

Hector Daniel Ruiz

Attorney at Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP

Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street 15Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

Joseph L Linares

Attorney at Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP

Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street 15Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

Peter J Farnese

Attorney at Beshada Farnese LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan M Short

Attorney at McCarter and English LLP

Four Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07102-4056

Omar Abdussellam Bareentto

Attorney at McCarter and English LLP

Four Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07102

Seth Morgan Jessee

Attorney at Rutan and Tucker LLP

611 Anton Boulevard Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Ronald P Oines

Attorney at Rutan and Tucker LLP

611 Anton Boulevard 14Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1931

 

Court Documents

#92

(#92) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#91

(#91) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#90

(#90) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09158 AB(JPRx). (rn) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#89

(#89) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Katelyn O'Reilly on behalf of Plaintiff Telebrands Corp. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#88

(#88) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Hector Daniel Ruiz on behalf of Plaintiff Telebrands Corp. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#87

(#87) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Joseph L Linares on behalf of Plaintiff Telebrands Corp. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#86

(#86) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Liza M Walsh on behalf of Plaintiff Telebrands Corp. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#85

(#85) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Altair Instruments Inc, (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#84

(#84) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Altair Instruments Inc.(Attorney Ronald P Oines added to party Altair Instruments Inc(pty:dft))(Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#5

(#5) AO120 Patent Form filed. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALTAIR INSTRUMENTS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH L. LINARES on behalf of TELEBRANDS CORP. (LINARES, JOSEPH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TELEBRANDS CORP.. (WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 11/16/2018)

1 #4

Form AO 120

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#84) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Altair Instruments Inc.(Attorney Ronald P Oines added to party Altair Instruments Inc(pty:dft))(Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

153 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#92) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#91) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#90) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09158 AB(JPRx). (rn) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#89) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Katelyn O'Reilly on behalf of Plaintiff Telebrands Corp. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#88) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Hector Daniel Ruiz on behalf of Plaintiff Telebrands Corp. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#87) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Joseph L Linares on behalf of Plaintiff Telebrands Corp. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#86) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Liza M Walsh on behalf of Plaintiff Telebrands Corp. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#85) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Altair Instruments Inc, (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#84) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Altair Instruments Inc.(Attorney Ronald P Oines added to party Altair Instruments Inc(pty:dft))(Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#83) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Peter J Farnese on behalf of Plaintiff Telebrands Corp (Attorney Peter J Farnese added to party Telebrands Corp(pty:pla))(Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Letter from Jonathan Short. (SHORT, JONATHAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Altair Instruments, Inc. on November 20, 2018, filed by TELEBRANDS CORP.. (WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by KATELYN O'REILLY on behalf of TELEBRANDS CORP. (O'REILLY, KATELYN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ on behalf of TELEBRANDS CORP. (RUIZ, HECTOR) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AO120 Patent Form filed. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALTAIR INSTRUMENTS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH L. LINARES on behalf of TELEBRANDS CORP. (LINARES, JOSEPH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TELEBRANDS CORP.. (WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ALTAIR INSTRUMENTS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9178228) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TELEBRANDS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Form AO 120)(WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALTAIR INSTRUMENTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TELEBRANDS CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seth Morgan Jessee

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald P Oines