This case was last updated from PACER on 08/20/2019 at 07:59:31 (UTC).

Tele-Physicians, P.C. et al v. Hailey

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 Tele-Physicians, P C filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Hailey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bernard G. Skomal and Anthony J. Battaglia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01177

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Bernard G. Skomal

Presiding Judge

Anthony J. Battaglia

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Specialist on Call Inc.

Tele-Physicans, P.C.

Tele-Physicians, P.C.

Defendant

Jennifer Hailey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Saul Kalt

Attorney at Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP

1600, 402 West Broadway, Suite 1050

San Diego, CA 92101-3532

Hubert Kim

Attorney at Wilson Petty Kosmo and Turner

550 West C Street, Suite 1050

San Diego, CA 92101-3532

Defendant Attorney

James Pickens

1104 Nw 88Th Way

Plantation, FL 33322

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Specialist on Call Inc., Tele-Physicians, P.C. (Kalt, Michael) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

15 #3

Declaration Of James Pickens In Support Of Respondents Motion To Dismiss

15 #2

Declaration Of Jennifer Hailey In Support Of Respondents Motion To Dismiss

#15

(#15) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join Necessary and Indispensable Party by Jennifer Hailey. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support Of Respondents Motion To Dismiss, #2 Declaration Of Jennifer Hailey In Support Of Respondents Motion To Dismiss, #3 Declaration Of James Pickens In Support Of Respondents Motion To Dismiss)(Pickens, James) (jrm). (Entered: 08/16/2019)

15 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities In Support Of Respondents Motion To Dismiss

5 #2

Declaration of James Camic

#14

(#14) ORDER Denying #5 Petitioner's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/17/2019. (acc) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

5 #1

Declaration of Michael S. Kalt

5 #16

Exhibit L to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits

5 #15

Exhibit K to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits

5 #17

Proof of Service

#5

(#5) Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue by Specialist on Call Inc., Tele-Physicans, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael S. Kalt, #2 Declaration of James Camic, #3 Declaration William E. Wallace, #4 Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #5 Exhibit A to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #6 Exhibit B to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #7 Exhibit C to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #8 Exhibit D to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #9 Exhibit E to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #10 Exhibit F to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #11 Exhibit G to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #12 Exhibit H to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #13 Exhibit I to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #14 Exhibit J to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #15 Exhibit K to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #16 Exhibit L to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #17 Proof of Service)(Kalt, Michael)(acc). (Entered: 07/01/2019)

5 #9

Exhibit E to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits

5 #10

Exhibit F to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits

5 #11

Exhibit G to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits

5 #12

Exhibit H to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits

5 #5

Exhibit A to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits

5 #6

Exhibit B to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Specialist on Call Inc., Tele-Physicians, P.C. (Kalt, Michael) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join Necessary and Indispensable Party : Responses due by 8/30/2019; Replies due by 9/6/2019; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 9/19/19 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(no document attached) (sc) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join Necessary and Indispensable Party by Jennifer Hailey. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support Of Respondents Motion To Dismiss, #2 Declaration Of Jennifer Hailey In Support Of Respondents Motion To Dismiss, #3 Declaration Of James Pickens In Support Of Respondents Motion To Dismiss)(Pickens, James) (jrm). (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER Denying #5 Petitioner's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/17/2019. (acc) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Specialist on Call Inc., Tele-Physicans, P.C. re #12 Reply to Response to Motion, (Kalt, Michael) (acc). (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by Specialist on Call Inc., Tele-Physicans, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Camic, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of James Camic, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of James Camic, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of James Camic, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of James Camic)(Kalt, Michael) (acc). (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by James N. Pickens on behalf of Jennifer Hailey (Pickens, James )Attorney James N. Pickens added to party Jennifer Hailey(pty:dft) (acc). (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER Requiring Reply From Petitioners. The Court ORDERS Petitioners to file a reply regarding subject matter jurisdiction. The reply must be filed with the Court by 7/12/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The reply is limited to ten (10) pages. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/10/2019.(acc) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue [Amended] filed by Jennifer Hailey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jennifer Hailey In Support of Respondent's [Amended] Opposition to Petitioners' Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order)(Pickens, James ) (acc). (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by Jennifer Hailey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jennifer Hailey in Support of Respondents' Opposition to Petitioners' Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order)(Pickens, James ) (acc). (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Hubert Kim on behalf of Specialist on Call Inc., Tele-Physicans, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kim, Hubert)Attorney Hubert Kim added to party Specialist on Call Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Hubert Kim added to party Tele-Physicans, P.C.(pty:pla) (acc). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue :Any response will be due by noon on Monday, 7/8/2019. Replies will not be accepted. (no document attached) (sc) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue by Specialist on Call Inc., Tele-Physicans, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael S. Kalt, #2 Declaration of James Camic, #3 Declaration William E. Wallace, #4 Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #5 Exhibit A to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #6 Exhibit B to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #7 Exhibit C to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #8 Exhibit D to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #9 Exhibit E to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #10 Exhibit F to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #11 Exhibit G to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #12 Exhibit H to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #13 Exhibit I to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #14 Exhibit J to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #15 Exhibit K to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #16 Exhibit L to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #17 Proof of Service)(Kalt, Michael)(acc). (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tele-Physicans, P.C., Specialist on Call Inc., as to Jennifer Hailey. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kalt, Michael) (acc). (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • (#1) COMPLAINT AND PETITION for an Order Compelling Arbitration and Staying Proceedings by Specialist on Call Inc., Tele-Physicans, P.C. (no document attached)(sxa)(jrd) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Specialist on Call Inc., Tele-Physicans, P.C. re 1 Motion to Compel Arbitration Award. (sxa)(jrd) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest filed by Specialist on Call Inc. Tele-Physicans, P.C. re 1 Motion to Compel Arbitration Award. No Parties With Financial Interest. (sxa)(jrd) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT AND PETITION for an Order Compelling Arbitration and Staying Proceedings, against Jennifer Hailey ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12647229.), filed by Tele-Physicans, P.C., Specialist on Call Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01177-AJB-BGS. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(sxa)(jrd) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.