This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2021 at 10:05:16 (UTC).

Tekvoke LLC v. Nextiva Incorporated

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 Tekvoke LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Nextiva Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael T Morrissey and Steven P Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02473

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Michael T Morrissey

Steven P Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tekvoke LLC

Defendant

Nextiva Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Howard L Wernow

Attorney at Sand Sebolt & Wernow Company LPA

4940 Munson St. Nw, Ste. 1100

Canton, OH 44718

Nathanael Melvin Brown

Attorney at Brown Patent Law

15100 N 78Th Way

Scottsdale, AZ 85260

Defendant Attorney

Peter Ryan Montecuollo

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP - Kansas City, MO

2555 Grand Blvd.

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER: The parties' Stipulation #17 is granted. Defendant shall have until March 22, 2021, to file an answer to the Complaint and otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 2/17/2021. (LMR) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#17

(#17) * Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint by Tekvoke LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Nathanael) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 2/16/2021 (LAD). (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#16

(#16) ORDER granting the parties' Joint Motion #14 : Defendant shall have until February 18, 2021, to file an answer to the Complaint and otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 1/20/2021. (LMR) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#15

(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nextiva Incorporated. (Montecuollo, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#14

(#14) * Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint re: #1 Complaint Stipulated Motion - First Request by Nextiva Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Montecuollo, Peter) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 1/20/2021 (LAD). (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 1/6/2021. (LMR) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#9

(#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Tekvoke LLC: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibits upon Brooklyn Vandeventer, Agent on 12/29/2020. (Brown, Nathanael) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Tekvoke LLC. (Brown, Nathanael) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tekvoke LLC. (Brown, Nathanael) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Tekvoke LLC. (MYE) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

5 #1

AO 121

#5

(#5) MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(MYE) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19005877 filed by Tekvoke LLC. (Brown, Nathanael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(MYE) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER: The parties' Stipulation #17 is granted. Defendant shall have until March 22, 2021, to file an answer to the Complaint and otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 2/17/2021. (LMR) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) * Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint by Tekvoke LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Nathanael) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 2/16/2021 (LAD). (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting the parties' Joint Motion #14 : Defendant shall have until February 18, 2021, to file an answer to the Complaint and otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 1/20/2021. (LMR) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nextiva Incorporated. (Montecuollo, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) * Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint re: #1 Complaint Stipulated Motion - First Request by Nextiva Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Montecuollo, Peter) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 1/20/2021 (LAD). (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 1/6/2021. (LMR) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Steven P Logan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-2473-PHX-SPL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docket(#11) Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Howard L Wernow on behalf of Plaintiff Tekvoke LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Tekvoke LLC: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibits upon Brooklyn Vandeventer, Agent on 12/29/2020. (Brown, Nathanael) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Tekvoke LLC. (Brown, Nathanael) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tekvoke LLC. (Brown, Nathanael) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Tekvoke LLC. (MYE) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(MYE) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Nextiva Incorporated. (MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19005877. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Morrissey. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-2473-PHX-MTM. Magistrate Election form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Tekvoke LLC. (Brown, Nathanael) (MYE) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19005877 filed by Tekvoke LLC. (Brown, Nathanael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(MYE) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nextiva Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Tekvoke LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter Ryan Montecuollo