This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2020 at 09:21:29 (UTC).

Tejera v. Mariam, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Tejera filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Mariam, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Peter J. Messitte. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-02434

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Peter J. Messitte

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juan Tejera

Defendants

Mariam, Inc.

DARCARS Automotive Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Shafer

Attorney at Shafer Associates, LLC

230 N. Washington St., Suite 200

Rockville, MD 20850

Defendant Attorneys

Charles H Henderson

Attorney at McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, P.A.

6411 Ivy Lane Ste 200

Greenbelt, MD 20770

John Paul Lynch

Attorney at McNamee Hosea Jernigan Kim Greenan and Lynch PA

6411 Ivy Lane Ste 200

Greenbelt, MD 20770

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan for Settlement. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/14/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE re #12 Scheduling Order filed by DARCARS Automotive Group, Mariam, Inc..(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/14/2021. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/1/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Mariam, Inc..(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Mariam, Inc..(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

9 #2

Exhibit B

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) Local Rule 103.5(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John Paul Lynch on behalf of DARCARS Automotive Group, Mariam, Inc. (Lynch, John) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by DARCARS Automotive Group, Mariam, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Civil Cover Sheet (Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#5

(#5) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/25/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against DARCARS Automotive Group, Mariam, Inc., filed by Juan Tejera.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

1 #9

Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Service

1 #8

Exhibit Exhibit A - Civil Case Information Report

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit A - Scheduling Notice and Order of Court

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit A - Order for Mandatory Settlement Conference

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit A - Scheduling Order

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Maryland, case number 482375-V. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8824068), filed by Mariam, Inc., DARCARS Automotive Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Writ of Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of New Case Number, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - Scheduling Order, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A - Order for Mandatory Settlement Conference, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A - Scheduling Notice and Order of Court, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A - Administrative Notice, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A - Civil Case Information Report, #9 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Service)(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan for Settlement. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/14/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE re #12 Scheduling Order filed by DARCARS Automotive Group, Mariam, Inc..(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/14/2021. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/1/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Mariam, Inc..(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Mariam, Inc..(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Local Rule 103.5(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John Paul Lynch on behalf of DARCARS Automotive Group, Mariam, Inc. (Lynch, John) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by DARCARS Automotive Group, Mariam, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Civil Cover Sheet (Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Mariam, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent DARCARS Automotive Group for Mariam, Inc..(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/25/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#4) Deficiency Notice -DARCARS Automotive Group and Mariam, Inc.- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 9/1/2020 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by DARCARS Automotive Group, Mariam, Inc. was filed incompletely. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Cover Sheet. To correct this problem, file the Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link the Civil Cover Sheet to #1 . (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY, MARYLAND. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against DARCARS Automotive Group, Mariam, Inc., filed by Juan Tejera.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Maryland, case number 482375-V. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8824068), filed by Mariam, Inc., DARCARS Automotive Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Writ of Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of New Case Number, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - Scheduling Order, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A - Order for Mandatory Settlement Conference, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A - Scheduling Notice and Order of Court, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A - Administrative Notice, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A - Civil Case Information Report, #9 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Service)(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less