This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2020 at 07:06:15 (UTC).

Tejada v. MediaNews Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 Tejada filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MediaNews Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-07574

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Monica Tejada

Defendant

MediaNews Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Walter Ottinger

Attorney at The Ottinger Firm PC

535 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant Attorney

Jill Louise Ripke

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

2901 N. Central Avenue, Suite 2000

Phoenix, AZ 85012

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by MediaNews Group, Inc... (Ripke, Jill) (Filed on 12/18/2020) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Stipulation without Proposed Order. The correct event can be found at: Civil Events > Motions and Related Filings > Stipulations > Stipulation without Proposed Order. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Monica Tejada, MediaNews Group, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/18/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by MediaNews Group, Inc. and Monica Tejada. (Ripke, Jill) (Filed on 12/4/2020) Modified on 12/7/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MediaNews Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MediaNews Group, Inc. is a Delaware corporation with MNG Enterprises, Inc. as its parent company for MediaNews Group, Inc.. (Ripke, Jill) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by MediaNews Group, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate MNG Enterprises, Inc., a Delaware Corporation for MediaNews Group, Inc.. (Ripke, Jill) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monica Tejada. MediaNews Group, Inc. served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. (Ottinger, Robert) (Filed on 11/19/2020) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Monica Tejada.. (Ottinger, Robert) (Filed on 11/12/2020) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 1/27/202 1. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to MediaNews Group, Inc.. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Ottinger, Robert) (Filed on 10/28/2020) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MediaNews Group, Inc. with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15125176.). Filed by Monica Tejada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ottinger, Robert) (Filed on 10/28/2020) Modified on 10/28/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MediaNews Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jill Louise Ripke(Designation Retained)