This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/14/2020 at 07:06:41 (UTC).

Tejada v. MediaNews Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 Tejada filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MediaNews Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacqueline Scott Corley. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-07222

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jacqueline Scott Corley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Monica Tejada

Defendant

MediaNews Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Walter Ottinger

Attorney at The Ottinger Firm PC

535 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Monica Tejada (Ottinger, Robert) (Filed on 10/27/2020) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monica Tejada. MediaNews Group, Inc. served on 10/19/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Ottinger, Robert) (Filed on 10/20/2020) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to MediaNews Group, Inc.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2021 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/29/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MediaNews Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15068582.). Filed byMonica Tejada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ottinger, Robert) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MediaNews Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert W. Ottinger