This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/12/2021 at 12:48:08 (UTC).

Tegtman v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Tegtman filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01129

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shawn Tegtman

Defendant

Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Loren G. Klitsas

Attorney at Celedonia & Klitsas, PC

550 Westcott, Suite 570

Houston, TX 77007

Michael H. Garatoni

Attorney at The Daspit Law Firm

431 Wolfe Rd.

San Antonio, TX 78216

Defendant Attorneys

Melanie Kemp Okon

Attorney at Munck Wilson Mandala, LLP

12770 Coit Road, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75251

Michael D. Rose

Attorney at Munck Wilson Mandala

600 Banner Place Tower, 12770 Coit Rd

Dallas, TX 75251

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Certified copy of #10 Order Remanding case to State Court sent via certified mail, as to Clerk, 425th Judicial District Court of Williamson County, Texas (lt) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING the parties' #9 Joint Motion to Remand to State Court. ORDER REMANDING this case to the 425th Judicial District Court of Williamson County, Texas. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court and Plaintiff's Stipulation by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rose, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael H. Garatoni on behalf of Shawn Tegtman (Garatoni, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

7 #3

Exhibit A-8

7 #2

Exhibit A-7

7 #1

Exhibit A-6

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Supplemental Filing of State Court Documents by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-6, #2 Exhibit A-7, #3 Exhibit A-8)(Rose, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael H. Garatoni on behalf of Shawn Tegtman. Attorney Michael H. Garatoni added to party Shawn Tegtman(pty:pla) (Garatoni, Michael) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#5

(#5) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Rose, Michael) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#3

(#3) Order Directing Loren G. Klitsas to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Okon, Melanie) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A and attachments

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-14183006), filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A and attachments, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Supp Civil Cover Sheet)(Okon, Melanie) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certified copy of #10 Order Remanding case to State Court sent via certified mail, as to Clerk, 425th Judicial District Court of Williamson County, Texas (lt) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING the parties' #9 Joint Motion to Remand to State Court. ORDER REMANDING this case to the 425th Judicial District Court of Williamson County, Texas. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court and Plaintiff's Stipulation by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rose, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael H. Garatoni on behalf of Shawn Tegtman (Garatoni, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Supplemental Filing of State Court Documents by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-6, #2 Exhibit A-7, #3 Exhibit A-8)(Rose, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael H. Garatoni on behalf of Shawn Tegtman. Attorney Michael H. Garatoni added to party Shawn Tegtman(pty:pla) (Garatoni, Michael) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Rose, Michael) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Directing Loren G. Klitsas to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Shawn Tegtman. (cj) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Okon, Melanie) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-14183006), filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A and attachments, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Supp Civil Cover Sheet)(Okon, Melanie) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lowe's Home Centers, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Loren G Klitsas