This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:20:13 (UTC).

Tegen et al v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Tegen filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-07986

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Corin Tegen

Sarah Tegen

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Enrique Elliot Adler

Attorney at Adler Law Group APLC

402 W. Broadway, Suite 860

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Eric Gordon Lasker

Attorney at Hollingsworth LLP

1350 I Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Joe G. Hollingsworth

Attorney at Hollingsworth LLP

1350 I Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Lasker, Eric) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

1 #4

Form Notice Of Intent To Use Process Server

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-170) regarding MDL No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Lasker, Eric) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DJO) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#6

(#6) Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-03075. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Lasker, Eric) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Corin Tegen, Sarah Tegen Process Server: HPS Process Service and Investigations (BAK) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

1 #3

Summons

6 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Damages And Demand For Jury Trial against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7573368, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Sarah Tegen, Corin Tegen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Form Notice Of Intent To Use Process Server)(Adler, Enrique) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Lasker, Eric) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Lasker, Eric) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Lasker, Eric) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; Eastern District of Missouri, 19-03075 Tegen, et al., opened in California Northern District as 19-07986 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 170 cc: JPMDL (wsnS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-03075. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DJO) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-170) regarding MDL No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Sarah Tegen, Corin Tegen. Monsanto Company served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Adler, Enrique) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Enrique Elliot Adler. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Corin Tegen, Sarah Tegen Process Server: HPS Process Service and Investigations (BAK) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT For Damages And Demand For Jury Trial against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7573368, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Sarah Tegen, Corin Tegen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Form Notice Of Intent To Use Process Server)(Adler, Enrique) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.