This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2022 at 09:19:45 (UTC).

Teeter et al v. NewRez LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2022 Teeter filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NewRez LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anne R. Traum and Craig S. Denney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00449

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anne R. Traum

Referral Judge

Craig S. Denney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Joseph M. Teeter

Donald Carter

Co-Administrators of the Estate of Jodi Leann Harms

Jodi Harms

Jodi L. Harms

Defendants and Counter Claimants

NewRez LLC

New Residential Mortgage, LLC

Shell Point Partners, LLC

Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing

New Residential Investment Corp.

RithmCap

Citizens Bank, National Association

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Sandra Newmark-Stephens, I

Wallace D. Stephens

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Melanie D Morgan

Natalie L Winslow

Ariel E. Stern

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HKL) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

#18

(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No. #17 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/18/2023. Motions due by 5/18/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 12/5/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

#17

(#17) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Co-Administrators of the Estate of Jodi Leann Harms.. (Newmark-Stephens, Sandra) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#16

(#16) Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Removal by Defendants Citizens Bank, National Association, New Residential Investment Corp., New Residential Mortgage, LLC, NewRez LLC, Shell Point Partners, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing.. (Morgan, Melanie) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #13 Statement in Removal Case by Defendants Citizens Bank, National Association, New Residential Investment Corp., New Residential Mortgage, LLC, NewRez LLC, Shell Point Partners, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Morgan, Melanie) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #6 Answer to Petition for Removal,,,, Counterclaim,,, Answer to Counterclaims filed by Joseph M. Teeter.(Newmark-Stephens, Sandra) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

#13

(#13) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Citizens Bank, National Association, New Residential Investment Corp., New Residential Mortgage, LLC, NewRez LLC, Shell Point Partners, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing.. (Morgan, Melanie) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#9

(#12) ORDER finding as moot #9 Stipulation. The instant action has been appropriately assigned to the unofficial Northern District of the United States District Court, District of Nevada. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/25/2022.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KLS) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#6

(#14) ANSWER to #6 Answer to Petition for Removal,,,, Counterclaim,,, Answer to Counterclaims filed by Joseph M. Teeter.(Newmark-Stephens, Sandra) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

#5

(#5) CIVIL STANDING ORDER of U.S. Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

4 #1

Exhibit 1

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendants New Residential Investment Corp., New Residential Mortgage, LLC, NewRez LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Morgan, Melanie) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Citizens Bank, National Association, New Residential Investment Corp, nka RithmCap, New Residential Mortgage, LLC, NewRez LLC, Shell Point Partners, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Rithm Capital Corp., Other Affiliate Caliber Homes Loans, Other Affiliate NRZ Acquisition LLC for New Residential Investment Corp, nka RithmCap; Corporate Parent Shellpoint Partners LLC for NewRez LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing; Other Affiliate Citizens Financial Group for Citizens Bank, National Association; Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition II LLC for New Residential Mortgage, LLC, Shell Point Partners, LLC added. (Morgan, Melanie) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HKL) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No. #17 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/18/2023. Motions due by 5/18/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 12/5/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Co-Administrators of the Estate of Jodi Leann Harms.. (Newmark-Stephens, Sandra) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Removal by Defendants Citizens Bank, National Association, New Residential Investment Corp., New Residential Mortgage, LLC, NewRez LLC, Shell Point Partners, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing.. (Morgan, Melanie) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #13 Statement in Removal Case by Defendants Citizens Bank, National Association, New Residential Investment Corp., New Residential Mortgage, LLC, NewRez LLC, Shell Point Partners, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Morgan, Melanie) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #6 Answer to Petition for Removal,,,, Counterclaim,,, Answer to Counterclaims filed by Joseph M. Teeter.(Newmark-Stephens, Sandra) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Citizens Bank, National Association, New Residential Investment Corp., New Residential Mortgage, LLC, NewRez LLC, Shell Point Partners, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing.. (Morgan, Melanie) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER finding as moot #9 Stipulation. The instant action has been appropriately assigned to the unofficial Northern District of the United States District Court, District of Nevada. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/25/2022.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KLS) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sandra Newmark-Stephens, I on behalf of Plaintiff Co-Administrators of the Estate of Jodi Leann Harms. (Newmark-Stephens, Sandra) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE Disclaimer of Interest Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure by Co-Administrators of the Estate of Jodi Leann Harms. (Newmark-Stephens, Sandra) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Fourth STIPULATION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE by Plaintiff Co-Administrators of the Estate of Jodi Leann Harms. (Newmark-Stephens, Sandra) (other) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sandra Newmark-Stephens, I on behalf of Plaintiff Co-Administrators of the Estate of Jodi Leann Harms. (Newmark-Stephens, Sandra) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sandra Newmark-Stephens, I on behalf of Plaintiff Co-Administrators of the Estate of Jodi Leann Harms. (Newmark-Stephens, Sandra) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendants' Answer to Complaint ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, and Defendant NewRez LLC dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing's Counterclaims (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/4/2022.), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, New Residential Investment Corp., Shell Point Partners, LLC, New Residential Mortgage, LLC, Citizens Bank, National Association, NewRez LLC. filed by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, New Residential Investment Corp., Shell Point Partners, LLC, New Residential Mortgage, LLC, Citizens Bank, National Association, NewRez LLC.(Morgan, Melanie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL STANDING ORDER of U.S. Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendants New Residential Investment Corp., New Residential Mortgage, LLC, NewRez LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Morgan, Melanie) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/13/2022. By Deputy Clerk: C. Smith. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/28/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/12/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (CJS) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Citizens Bank, National Association, New Residential Investment Corp, nka RithmCap, New Residential Mortgage, LLC, NewRez LLC, Shell Point Partners, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Rithm Capital Corp., Other Affiliate Caliber Homes Loans, Other Affiliate NRZ Acquisition LLC for New Residential Investment Corp, nka RithmCap; Corporate Parent Shellpoint Partners LLC for NewRez LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing; Other Affiliate Citizens Financial Group for Citizens Bank, National Association; Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition II LLC for New Residential Mortgage, LLC, Shell Point Partners, LLC added. (Morgan, Melanie) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Case Number CV22-01306, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7079228) by New Residential Investment Corp, nka RithmCap, Shell Point Partners, LLC, National Association, New Residential Mortgage, LLC, Citizens Bank, NewRez LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Morgan, Melanie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less