This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2019 at 09:29:21 (UTC).

TechShell, Inc. v. Max Interactive, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 TechShell, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Max Interactive, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas F. McCormick, Andrew J. Guilford and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00608

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

Presiding Judges

Douglas F. McCormick

Andrew J. Guilford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

TechShell, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Max Interactive, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Cheryl S Chang

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Russell T Wong

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Dipu A Doshi

1825 Eye Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Megan R Wood

1825 Eye Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Peter J Schulz

Attorney at Greco Traficante Schulz and Brick

600 West Broadway Suite 960

San Diego, CA 92101

Scott D Wofsy

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

201 Broad Street

Stamford, CT 06901

Christopher J Capelli

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

201 Broad Street

Stamford, CT 06901

Nasar M Khan

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

300 South Grand Avenue 26Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

David T Van Der Laan

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

111 South Wacker Drive Suite 4100

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#52

(#52) ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: The Settlement Conference is placed on calendar for September 5, 2019, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 9B, 9th Floor, 411 W. Fourth Street, Santa Ana, California, 2701. No later than five (5) days prior to the Settlement Conference, each party shall submit a Confidential Settlement Conference Statement directly to the Chambers of Judge Spaeth via email to ADS_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. The Statements should not be filed with the Clerk of the Court and they will not be made part of the casefile. **See Order for details** (kh) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#50

(#50) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Dismiss and Strike Max Interactive Inc's Third Counterclaim and Fifth Affirmative Defense #35 filed by Plaintiff TechShell, Inc.. (Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#49

(#49) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF CASEDEADLINES #44 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court has considered the parties Joint Stipulation and sets the following deadlines: Discovery cut-off 4/7/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2020 at 8:30 AM. Jury Trial set for 7/7/2020 at 9:00 AM. (See document for further details) (es) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#47

RESTRICTED

44 #1

Proposed Order

#44

(#44) Joint STIPULATION for Order Approving Case Deadlines filed by Plaintiff TechShell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

35 #2

Proposed Order

35 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

#35

(#45) OPPOSITION to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Dismiss and Strike Max Interactive Inc's Third Counterclaim and Fifth Affirmative Defense #35 filed by Defendant Max Interactive, Inc.. (Khan, Nasar) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (esa) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Max Interactive, Inc. (esa) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

6 #1

CV-11C

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (esa) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#5

(#5) STATEMENT re Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff TechShell, Inc. (Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff TechShell, Inc., identifying Gladstone Investment Corporation; Fairhaven Group, Inc.. (Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff TechShell, Inc.. (Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff TechShell, Inc.. (Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#1

(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Max Interactive, Inc. (esa) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: The Settlement Conference is placed on calendar for September 5, 2019, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 9B, 9th Floor, 411 W. Fourth Street, Santa Ana, California, 2701. No later than five (5) days prior to the Settlement Conference, each party shall submit a Confidential Settlement Conference Statement directly to the Chambers of Judge Spaeth via email to ADS_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. The Statements should not be filed with the Clerk of the Court and they will not be made part of the casefile. **See Order for details** (kh) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • (#51) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING PRE-SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. This matter is set for a Telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference Call on Thursday, July 18, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Call in information shall be provided by separate email to counsel of record.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Dismiss and Strike Max Interactive Inc's Third Counterclaim and Fifth Affirmative Defense #35 filed by Plaintiff TechShell, Inc.. (Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF CASEDEADLINES #44 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court has considered the parties Joint Stipulation and sets the following deadlines: Discovery cut-off 4/7/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2020 at 8:30 AM. Jury Trial set for 7/7/2020 at 9:00 AM. (See document for further details) (es) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/24/19 10:00 am re Transcript #47 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Baird, Miriam) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/24/19 10:00 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Miriam Baird, phone number mvb11893@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/5/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/1/2019. (Baird, Miriam) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and Strike Max Interactive Inc.'s Third Counterclaim and Fifth Affirmative Defense filed by Defendant Max Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Part 1, #3 Exhibit B - Part 2)(Khan, Nasar) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) OPPOSITION to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Dismiss and Strike Max Interactive Inc's Third Counterclaim and Fifth Affirmative Defense #35 filed by Defendant Max Interactive, Inc.. (Khan, Nasar) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) Joint STIPULATION for Order Approving Case Deadlines filed by Plaintiff TechShell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER (1) DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING ADDITIONAL PRETRIAL DATES AND (2) CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND STRIKE (DKT. NO. 35) by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: By July 1, 2019, the parties are ORDERED to file a joint stipulation and proposed order with their updated proposals regarding any additional pretrial dates (including patent-specific dates) For reasons of calendar management and judicial economy, the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and Strike Defendant's Third Counterclaim and Fifth Affirmative Defense (Dkt. No. 35) is CONTINUED from July 22, 2019 to August 5, 2019 at 10:00 AM. (See document for details) (es) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Dipu A. Doshi. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Russell T. Wong. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (esa) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Max Interactive, Inc. (esa) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (esa) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATEMENT re Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff TechShell, Inc. (Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff TechShell, Inc., identifying Gladstone Investment Corporation; Fairhaven Group, Inc.. (Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff TechShell, Inc.. (Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff TechShell, Inc.. (Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23473354 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff TechShell, Inc.. (Attorney Cheryl S Chang added to party TechShell, Inc.(pty:pla))(Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TECHSHELL INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Megan R. Wood

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cheryl S Chang

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell T. Wong