This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/03/2019 at 08:04:00 (UTC).

Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC v. Sakar International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/04/2019 Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sakar International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvin K. Hellerstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-08222

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alvin K. Hellerstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC

Defendant

Sakar International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Louis Mark Heidelberger

Attorney at The Law Offices of Louis M. Heidelberger Esquire, LLC.

350 E. 79Th Street, Apt. 31C

New York, NY 10075

Defendant Attorney

Douglas Alan Miro

Attorney at Amster, Rothstein & Ebenstein LLC

90 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit Claim Chart

1 #1

Exhibit U.S. RE:41,685

#1

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint. SO ORDERED. Sakar International, Inc. answer due 11/7/2019. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/7/2019) (jca) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Douglas A. Miro dated October 4, 2019. Document filed by Sakar International, Inc..(Miro, Douglas) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Alan Miro on behalf of Sakar International, Inc.. (Miro, Douglas) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC.(Heidelberger, Louis) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Louis Mark Heidelberger to RE-FILE Document #10 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): no signature or s/. (ldi) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SECOND RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC.(Heidelberger, Louis) Modified on 9/23/2019 (ldi). (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Sakar International, Inc. served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. Service was accepted by David Doe. Document filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Heidelberger, Louis) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: The Honorable Alvin K. Hellerstein, U.S.D.J. has ordered that counsel for all parties and any pro se parties attend a conference, at the time and place fixed below, for the purpose of Case Management and scheduling pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Counsel or pro se plaintiff receiving this notice is directed to furnish all attorneys and any pro se parties in this action, as and when they appear, with copies of this order and enclosures, and to retain due proof thereof. If you are unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, you must forthwith send a copy of this notice and enclosures to that party personally, informing the party that any unrepresented party is required to appear at the conference in person. Counsel attending the conference should be the attorneys who will try the action, or who have full authority to resolve all issues to be decided, to enter into stipulations and who are authorized to discuss settlement. DATE, PLACE AND TIME OF CONFERENCE: November 15, 2019 at the UnitedStates Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007, in Courtroom 14D at 10:00 a.m. It is Ordered that counsel to whom this Order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel and retaining verification of such in the case file. Do not fax such verification to Chambers. Please include telephone numbers and fax numbers on all documents submitted to the Court. (Initial Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/17/19) (yv) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jgo) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Louis Mark Heidelberger to RE-FILE Document #5 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): the PDF does not list the corporate parent(s)/other affiliate(s) entered upon filing. (ldi) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Louis Mark Heidelberger. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC; Sakar International, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (jgo) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Louis Mark Heidelberger. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 18:1341; County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 35:271; the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Cerinet USA, Inc. for Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. Document filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC.(Heidelberger, Louis) Modified on 9/5/2019 (ldi). (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Heidelberger, Louis) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Heidelberger, Louis) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sakar International Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Heidelberger, Louis) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sakar International, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17539821)Document filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. RE:41,685, #2 Exhibit Claim Chart)(Heidelberger, Louis) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less