This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 15:22:11 (UTC).

Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC v. Lifi Labs, Inc., LIFX

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Lifi Labs, Inc , LIFX. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan van Keulen and Phyllis J. Hamilton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00392

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Susan van Keulen

Phyllis J. Hamilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC

Defendants

Lifi Labs, Inc.

Lifi Labs, Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as LIFX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Louis M. Heidelberger

Attorney at The Law Offices of Louis M. Heidelberger Esq. LLC.

1229 Laurel Oak Lane

York, PA 17403

Brandon C Fernald

Attorney at Fernald Law Group LLP

510 W 6Th Street, Suite 700, Los Angeles

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Brandon C. Fernald

Attorney at Fernald Law Group LLP

510 W 6Th Street, Suite 700, Los Angeles

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Defendant Attorneys

Srinivas Giriraj Pathmanaban

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

140 Scott Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Richard Gregory Frenkel

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

140 Scott Dr.

Menlo Park, CA 94025-1008

Gaurav Asthana

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) SECOND STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Lifi Labs, Inc., Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 3/19/2019) Modified on 3/20/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Gaurav Asthana (Asthana, Gaurav) (Filed on 3/19/2019) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#17

(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. All Defendants. (Fernald, Brandon) (Filed on 2/14/2019) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Lifi Labs, Inc., Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 2/13/2019) Modified on 2/13/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2019 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/12/19. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#14

(#14) Amended ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a United States District Court Judge. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 2/12/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

13 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#13

(#13) *** Docketed in Error. See Docket #14 *** ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a United States District Court Judge. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order Executive Committee on 2/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#11

(#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lifi Labs, Inc... (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 2/8/2019) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Lifi Labs, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Honeywell International Inc., Other Affiliate Cerinet USA, Inc. for Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Fernald, Brandon) (Filed on 1/22/2019) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Fernald, Brandon) (Filed on 1/22/2019) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

#Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]DO NOT attach the proposed summons or other pleadings that are notassociated with the initiating document. Proposed summon sesshould be e-filed separately using the appropriate events after you have filed your initiatingdocument and attachments.Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SECOND STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Lifi Labs, Inc., Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 3/19/2019) Modified on 3/20/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Gaurav Asthana (Asthana, Gaurav) (Filed on 3/19/2019) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REMINDER: Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials PJH immediately after the case number pursuant to the order reassigning case (document #14 ). Moving forward, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:19-cv-00392-PJH. Re: #17 Summons Returned Executed filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. All Defendants. (Fernald, Brandon) (Filed on 2/14/2019) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Lifi Labs, Inc., Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 2/13/2019) Modified on 2/13/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2019 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/12/19. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Amended ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a United States District Court Judge. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 2/12/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) *** Docketed in Error. See Docket #14 *** ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a United States District Court Judge. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order Executive Committee on 2/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • (#12) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lifi Labs, Inc... (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 2/8/2019) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Gregory Frenkel (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 2/8/2019) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Srinivas Giriraj Pathmanaban (Pathmanaban, Srinivas) (Filed on 2/8/2019) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC.. (Fernald, Brandon) (Filed on 2/6/2019) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Lifi Labs, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]DO NOT attach the proposed summons or other pleadings that are notassociated with the initiating document. Proposed summon sesshould be e-filed separately using the appropriate events after you have filed your initiatingdocument and attachments.Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • (#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/6/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Honeywell International Inc., Other Affiliate Cerinet USA, Inc. for Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Fernald, Brandon) (Filed on 1/22/2019) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Fernald, Brandon) (Filed on 1/22/2019) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13024417.). Filed byTechnical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Fernald, Brandon) (Filed on 1/22/2019) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Technical Led Intellectual Property, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Gregory Frenkel