This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/25/2019 at 07:36:11 (UTC).

Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC v. Kuled, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/26/2019 Technical LED Intellectual Property - Patent , LLC filed an Intellectual Property lawsuit against Kuled, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy F Atlas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03208

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy F Atlas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC

Defendant

Kuled, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J Michael Young

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Kuled, Inc. served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019, filed.(Young, J) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks, AO-120, Notified. (LoriPurifoyadi, 4) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/13/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Kuled, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC, filed. (Young, J) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC, filed.(Young, J) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Kuled, Inc., filed.(Young, J) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Kuled, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23057739) filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Young, J) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less