This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 14:14:25 (UTC).

Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC v. Irtronix, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2019 Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Irtronix, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patrick J. Walsh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04740

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Walsh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC

Defendants

Irtronix LED, Inc.

Irtronix, Inc. d/b/a Euri Lighting

Irtronix, Inc.

Irtronix, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Euri Lighting

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandon C Fernald

Defendant Attorney

Brenton R Babcock

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (et) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Irtronix LED, Inc. answer now due 8/8/2019; Irtronix, Inc. answer now due 8/8/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Irtronix LED, Inc. ; Irtronix, Inc..(Babcock, Brenton) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Irtronix LED, Inc., Irtronix, Inc., (Babcock, Brenton) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brenton R Babcock on behalf of Defendants Irtronix LED, Inc., Irtronix, Inc. (Attorney Brenton R Babcock added to party Irtronix LED, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Brenton R Babcock added to party Irtronix, Inc.(pty:dft))(Babcock, Brenton) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #11 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Service was not made pursuant to FRCP 5(b)(2)(D). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (sbou) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#12

(#12) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC, upon Defendant Irtronix, Inc. served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#11

(#11) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC, upon Defendant Irtronix LED, Inc. served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Louis M. Heidelberger. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Irtronix LED, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Irtronix, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

7 #1

CV-11C

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC, identifying Cerinet USA, Inc.; Honeywell International Inc.. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23833616 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Attorney Brandon C Fernald added to party Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC(pty:pla))(Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (et) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Irtronix LED, Inc. answer now due 8/8/2019; Irtronix, Inc. answer now due 8/8/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Irtronix LED, Inc. ; Irtronix, Inc..(Babcock, Brenton) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Irtronix LED, Inc., Irtronix, Inc., (Babcock, Brenton) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brenton R Babcock on behalf of Defendants Irtronix LED, Inc., Irtronix, Inc. (Attorney Brenton R Babcock added to party Irtronix LED, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Brenton R Babcock added to party Irtronix, Inc.(pty:dft))(Babcock, Brenton) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #11 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Service was not made pursuant to FRCP 5(b)(2)(D). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (sbou) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC, upon Defendant Irtronix, Inc. served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC, upon Defendant Irtronix LED, Inc. served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Louis M. Heidelberger. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Irtronix LED, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Irtronix, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC, identifying Cerinet USA, Inc.; Honeywell International Inc.. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23833616 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Attorney Brandon C Fernald added to party Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC(pty:pla))(Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less