1:19-CV-23607
08/28/2019
Disposed - Other Disposed
Intellectual Property - Patent
Florida Southern District
Darrin P. Gayles
Technical LED Intellectual Property LLC
Hamilton Hills, LLC
Joshua B. Spector
Louis M. Heidelberger
William Rafael Trueba, Jr.
(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Technical LED Intellectual Property LLC (Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
Text of Proposed Order
(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Hamilton Hills, LLC. Attorney William Rafael Trueba, Jr added to party Hamilton Hills, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Trueba, William) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission
Certification Certification of Louis M Heidelberger Esq.
(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Louis M Heidelberger Esq.. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11985255 by Technical LED Intellectual Property LLC. Responses due by 9/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Louis M Heidelberger Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Technical LED Intellectual Property LLC identifying Other Affiliate Honeywell International Inc., Other Affiliate Cerinet USA, Inc. for Technical LED Intellectual Property LLC (Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
(#6) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Louis M. Heidelberger, mailing date August 29, 2019, (cco) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
Complaint
(#5) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
(#4) Summons Issued as to Hamilton Hills, LLC. (mee) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
Exhibit Exhibit B - Claim Chart
Exhibit Exhibit A - United States Patent No. RE41,685
Summon(s) Summons
Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
(#1) COMPLAINT against Hamilton Hills, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11940509, filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons, #3 Supplement AO120 Report for USPTO, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - United States Patent No. RE41,685, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B - Claim Chart)(Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
(#13) PAPERLESS ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, pursuant to #12 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
[-] Read Less(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Technical LED Intellectual Property LLC (Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
[-] Read Less(#11) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint or or before October 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
[-] Read Less(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Hamilton Hills, LLC. Attorney William Rafael Trueba, Jr added to party Hamilton Hills, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Trueba, William) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
[-] Read Less(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Louis M. Heidelberger is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiff for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Heidelberger at louis.heidelberger@gmail.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
[-] Read Less(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Louis M Heidelberger Esq.. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11985255 by Technical LED Intellectual Property LLC. Responses due by 9/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Louis M Heidelberger Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
[-] Read Less(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Technical LED Intellectual Property LLC identifying Other Affiliate Honeywell International Inc., Other Affiliate Cerinet USA, Inc. for Technical LED Intellectual Property LLC (Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
[-] Read Less(#6) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Louis M. Heidelberger, mailing date August 29, 2019, (cco) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
[-] Read Less(#5) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
[-] Read Less(#4) Summons Issued as to Hamilton Hills, LLC. (mee) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
[-] Read Less(#3) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/28/2019. (jdo) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
[-] Read Less(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
[-] Read Less(#1) COMPLAINT against Hamilton Hills, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11940509, filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons, #3 Supplement AO120 Report for USPTO, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - United States Patent No. RE41,685, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B - Claim Chart)(Spector, Joshua) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
[-] Read Less