Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/09/2019 at 07:17:23 (UTC).

Teague v. Kohn et al

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 Teague filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Kohn. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Staci M. Yandle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01110

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Staci M. Yandle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Raymond Teauge

Sumner, IL 62466

Raymond Teague

Lincoln, IL 62656

Defendants

Wattem

Nurse Gallo

Nurse Ellison

L.T. Mcdonald

C/O Hopper

C/O Hutcheson

Mcfarlen

Nurse Dowdy

Routien

Kohn

C/O Costintino

Nurse Stroyer

Warden Brookhart

Cunningham

John/Jane Doe

Mays

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Admin. Order 257

#7

(#7) ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order 257, this case has been selected for reassignment to a Magistrate Judge. Within 21 days of this Order, any party not previously having filed a Notice and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form in this case must file the attached form indicating that party's consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent due by 12/11/2019.. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Admin. Order 257)(jaj) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Raymond Teague. (jsm2) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 19-cv-1110-SMY. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. A copy of the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form is attached to this Order. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/10/2019. (jsm2) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel by Raymond Teauge. (jsm2) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Raymond Teauge. (jsm2) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

1 #1

Exhibits

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Raymond Teauge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits).(jsm2) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER re #7 Order Selecting Case for Reassignment: The 21-day deadline set forth in the Court's Order does not apply to unserved parties. Deadlines for newly served parties to consent or decline to consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge will be set by the Court at a later date. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/3/2019. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order 257, this case has been selected for reassignment to a Magistrate Judge. Within 21 days of this Order, any party not previously having filed a Notice and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form in this case must file the attached form indicating that party's consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent due by 12/11/2019.. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Admin. Order 257)(jaj) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION - Scanning Lawrence turned off for receipt of electronic filings. (jsm2) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Raymond Teague. (jsm2) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $ 26.52 received, receipt number 34625096954 (amv) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #2 ). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $26.52. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid.In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Lawrence Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/17/2019. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 19-cv-1110-SMY. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. A copy of the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form is attached to this Order. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/10/2019. (jsm2) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel by Raymond Teauge. (jsm2) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Raymond Teauge. (jsm2) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Raymond Teauge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits).(jsm2) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less