This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2019 at 07:22:07 (UTC).

SCHEELER v. PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 SCHEELER filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joel Schneider and Noel L. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-12596

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joel Schneider

Presiding Judge

Noel L. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TEAMSTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND OF PHILADELPHIA AND VICINITY

6981 N. Park Drive, Suite 400

Pennsauken, NJ 08109

MARIA SCHEELER

Defendant

PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK

801 Market Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW D. AREMAN

Attorney at MARKOWITZ & RICHMAN

123 South Broad Street, Suite 2020

Philadelphia, PA 09109

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibits A and B

1 #2

Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#4

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATED ORDER Granting Defendant an extension of time to respond to the complaint. Defendant's response is now due 8/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/10/2019. (rtm, ) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK. (MILLMAN, STEVEN) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATED ORDER Granting an extension of time to 7/15/2019 for Defendant to respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/17/2019. (rtm, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by MARIA SCHEELER. (AREMAN, MATTHEW) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARIA SCHEELER, ADMINISTRATOR OF THE TEAMSTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND OF PHILADELPHIA AND VICINITY. PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (AREMAN, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (bf, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TEAMSTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND OF PHILADELPHIA AND VICINITY. (AREMAN, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9671482), filed by TEAMSTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND OF PHILADELPHIA AND VICINITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(AREMAN, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK (NEWSPAPERS), LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTHEW D. AREMAN(Designation Retained)