This case was last updated from PACER on 11/01/2020 at 08:43:12 (UTC).

Teamster Members Retirement Plan v. Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 Teamster Members Retirement Plan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Allianz Global Investors U S LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07154

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Teamster Members Retirement Plan

GCIU Inter-Local Pension Plan

Defendants

Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc.

Allianz SE

PFP Holdings Inc.

Allianz Asset Management GmbH

Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC

Allianz Asset Management of America LLC

Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC

Allianz Asset Management of America L.P.

Allianz of America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Curtis Fredericks

Attorney at Scott + Scott, L.L.P.( NYC)

230 Park Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10169

Zachary Michael Vaughan

Attorney at Scott & Scott LLP

The Helmsley Building, 230 Park Ave, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10169

Donald A Broggi

Attorney at Scott + Scott, L.L.P.( NYC)

230 Park Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10169

Defendant Attorneys

Ann-Elizabeth Ostrager

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Robert Joseph Giuffra, Jr.

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Kathleen Suzanne McArthur

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Hilary M. Williams

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Mary Elizabeth Brust

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP (NYC)

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Amy D. Roy

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

800 Boylston

Boston, MA 02199

Cole A Goodman

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

Prudential Tower, 800 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02199

Robert A. Skinner

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP (MA)

800 Boylston St

Boston, MA 02199

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING WAIVER OF SERVICE AND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among Plaintiff and Defendants, through their respective undersigned counsel, as follows: Subject to the provisions set forth in paragraph 2 below and the reservation of rights in paragraph 3 below, Defendants Allianz SE and Allianz Asset Management GmbH waive service of the Summons and Complaint, and waive any objections to the absence of a summons or of service in the Action. The filing of this Stipulation shall be deemed the filing of a waiver under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d)(4). Accordingly, Plaintiff is not required to file proof of service, and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure shall apply as if summonses and a complaint had been served on the Defendants identified in this paragraph 1 at the time of the filing of this Stipulation. The time for Defendants to move against, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is adjourned as though the Adjournment Order were entered in this Action and further set forth in this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/22/2020) (rro) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#29

(#29) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America, Inc., PFP Holdings Inc...(Giuffra, Robert) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#28

(#28) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #24 Motion for Cole A. Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 24. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/21/2020) (ks) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#27

(#27) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #23 Motion for Robert A. Skinner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 23. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/21/2020) (rro) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#25

(#25) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Elizabeth Brust on behalf of Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Brust, Mary) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#24

(#24) MOTION for Cole A. Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21736345. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Goodman, Cole) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#21

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America, Inc., PFP Holdings Inc...(pc) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#5

(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Teamster Members Retirement Plan..(Fredericks, William) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America, Inc., PFP Holdings Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teamster Members Retirement Plan..(Fredericks, William) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#1

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America, Inc., PFP Holdings Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teamster Members Retirement Plan..(Fredericks, William) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING WAIVER OF SERVICE AND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among Plaintiff and Defendants, through their respective undersigned counsel, as follows: Subject to the provisions set forth in paragraph 2 below and the reservation of rights in paragraph 3 below, Defendants Allianz SE and Allianz Asset Management GmbH waive service of the Summons and Complaint, and waive any objections to the absence of a summons or of service in the Action. The filing of this Stipulation shall be deemed the filing of a waiver under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d)(4). Accordingly, Plaintiff is not required to file proof of service, and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure shall apply as if summonses and a complaint had been served on the Defendants identified in this paragraph 1 at the time of the filing of this Stipulation. The time for Defendants to move against, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is adjourned as though the Adjournment Order were entered in this Action and further set forth in this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/22/2020) (rro) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America, Inc., PFP Holdings Inc...(Giuffra, Robert) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #24 Motion for Cole A. Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 24. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/21/2020) (ks) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #23 Motion for Robert A. Skinner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 23. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/21/2020) (rro) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #22 Motion for Amy D. Roy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/21/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #24 MOTION for Cole A. Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21736345. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #23 MOTION for Robert A. Skinner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21736195. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #22 MOTION for Amy D. Roy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21736082. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Elizabeth Brust on behalf of Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Brust, Mary) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Cole A. Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21736345. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Goodman, Cole) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Robert A. Skinner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21736195. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Skinner, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Amy D. Roy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21736082. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Roy, Amy) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America, Inc., PFP Holdings Inc...(pc) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Katherine Polk Failla as possibly related to 20cv5615. (pc) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney William Curtis Fredericks to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Teamster Members Retirement Plan..(Fredericks, William) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-05615-KPF. Document filed by Teamster Members Retirement Plan..(Fredericks, William) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America, Inc., PFP Holdings Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teamster Members Retirement Plan..(Fredericks, William) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fredericks, William) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America, Inc., PFP Holdings Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21457170)Document filed by Teamster Members Retirement Plan..(Fredericks, William) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PFP Holdings Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC is a litigant