This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/14/2020 at 09:52:47 (UTC).

Taylor v. Wright et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 Taylor filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Wright. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas E Rogers, III and Mary Geiger Lewis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03235

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Thomas E Rogers, III

Presiding Judge

Mary Geiger Lewis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ken Taylor

Defendants

Deputy R. Williams

Ebony Black

Sergeant Kyle W. Center

Lieutenant Tim Wilson

Spartanburg County Detention Center

Deputy R. Simpson

Amber S. Menditto

Major Allen Freeman

Sergeant Joclyn R. Gray

Spartanburg County Sheriff's Office

Chuck Wright

Deputy Dustin Peace

Allane Roach

Deputy J. L. Hall

Sergeant Jeremy R. Thomas

Deputy Mulholland

Spartanburg County

Deputy J. Gallman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Daniel Atkinson

Attorney at Wilkes Law Firm

127 Dunbar Street, Suite 200

Spartanburg, SC 29306

Michael BT Wilkes

Attorney at Wilkes Law Firm

127 Dunbar Street, Suite 200

Spartanburg, SC 29306

Defendant Attorneys

James P Walsh

Attorney at Clarkson Walsh Rheney and Turner

Po Box 6728

Greenville, SC 29606

Philip Christopher Smith, Jr

Attorney at Clarkson Walsh and Coulter PA

Po Box 6728, 1164 Woodruff Oaks Lane

Greenville, SC 29606

Andrew Todd Darwin

Attorney at Holcombe Bomar Gunn and Bradford

Po Box 1897

Spartanburg, SC 29304

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#19

18 #1

Exhibit Affidavit of Service- Gallman

#18

#17

#16

14 #1

Exhibit Affidavit of Service- Deputy Peace

#14

13 #2

Exhibit UPS Proof of Service- Williams

13 #1

Exhibit UPS Proof of Service- Black

#13

11 #1

State Court Documents Acknowledgment of Receipt of Notice of Removal

#11

#6

#5

#4

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/7/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/21/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 1/21/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/18/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/17/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/16/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/16/2020, Discovery due by 6/15/2020, Motions due by 6/30/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/14/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 10/19/2020, Mediation Due by 8/31/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at no later than September 28, 2020. Written responses are due seven (7) days thereafter. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 12/18/2019. (dsto, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ANSWER to Complaint by Ebony Black, J. Gallman, Dustin Peace, R. Williams.(Walsh, James) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ken Taylor Of Deputy Bill Simpson Without Prejudice (Atkinson, Charles) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ken Taylor. J. Gallman served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service- Gallman)(Atkinson, Charles) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Spartanburg County, Spartanburg County Detention Center, Spartanburg County Sheriff's Office, Chuck Wright.(Darwin, Andrew) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by Spartanburg County, Spartanburg County Detention Center, Spartanburg County Sheriff's Office, Chuck Wright. (Darwin, Andrew) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER Entry No. 7,8,9 & 10 Reason: to correct filing errors. Corrected Filing Document Number #12 , #13 , and #14 . (dsto, ) (Entered: 12/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ken Taylor. Dustin Peace served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service- Deputy Peace)(Atkinson, Charles) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ken Taylor. Ebony Black served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; R. Williams served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit UPS Proof of Service- Black, #2 Exhibit UPS Proof of Service- Williams)(Atkinson, Charles) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Summons Returned Unexecuted (Restricted Access) by Ken Taylor as to J. Gallman, R. Simpson, R. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Non-Service-Gallman, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Non-Service- Williams, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Non-Service- Simpson)(Atkinson, Charles) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Spartanburg County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Acknowledgment of Receipt of Notice of Removal)(Walsh, James) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ken Taylor.(Atkinson, Charles) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 12/9/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 12/23/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 12/23/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/21/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/18/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/18/2020, Discovery due by 5/18/2020, Motions due by 6/1/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/17/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 9/21/2020, Mediation Due by 7/31/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at no later than August 31, 2020. Written responses are due seven (7) days thereafter. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 11/19/2019. (dsto, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Kyle W. Center, Allen Freeman, Joclyn R. Gray, J. L. Hall, Amber S. Menditto, Deputy Mulholland, Allane Roach, Jeremy R. Thomas and Tim Wilson. (dsto, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Kyle W. Center, Allen Freeman, Joclyn R. Gray, J. L. Hall, Amber S. Menditto, Deputy Mulholland, Allane Roach, Jeremy R. Thomas and Tim Wilson.(dsto, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-42-4020. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8779398), filed by Jeremy R. Thomas, Allen Freeman, J. L. Hall, Kyle W. Center, Amber S. Menditto, Deputy Mulholland, Allane Roach, Tim Wilson, Joclyn R. Gray. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service)(dsto, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Spartanburg County Detention Center Facility is a litigant

Latest cases where SPARTANBURG COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where Spartanburg County Sheriff's Office is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Daniel Atkinson