This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/16/2021 at 13:28:49 (UTC).

Taylor v. William Donaldson Correctional Facility et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 Taylor filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against William Donaldson Correctional Facility. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Annemarie Carney Axon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00832

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Annemarie Carney Axon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Takira Taylor

Defendants

Lt. Eddie Watts

William Donaldson Correctional Facility

Alabama Department of Corrections d/b/a William Donaldson Correctional Facility

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicole Davis Edwards

Attorney at EDWARDS & EDWARDS ATTORNEYS & MEDIATORS

1530 3Rd Avenue North

Bessemer, AL 35020

Blake Clifton Edwards

Attorney at EDWARDS & EDWARDS ATTORNEYS AND MEDIATORS PLLC

3603 Pine Lane Se, Ste. C

Bessemer, AL 35022

Defendant Attorneys

Gwendolyn B Garner

Attorney at STATE OF ALABAMA OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

501 Washington Ave., P O Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130-0152

Thomas Michael McCarthy

Attorney at Alabama Department of Corrections

301 S Ripley St, P O Box 301501

Montgomery, AL 31630-1501

Bart G Harmon

Attorney at ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

301 South Ripley Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER - Due to the recent high numbers in COVID testing and the safety issues brought about by those numbers, Judge Axon is currently only conducting video hearings. The court sets this case for a video hearing Friday, August 13, 2021, 4:00 PM. Defendant Eddie Watts is to be present at the hearing, as well as counsel for all parties. Attorney Gwendolyn Garner is directed to forward a copy of this order to Mr. Watts and to ensure that he is aware of his required attendance to this video hearing. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/11/21. (SAC) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Withdraw #13 Answer to Complaint by Eddie Watts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Watts)(Garner, Gwendolyn) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Blake Clifton Edwards on behalf of Takira Taylor (Edwards, Blake) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Bart G Harmon on behalf of Alabama Department of Corrections (Harmon, Bart) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER - The court sets this case for a hearing Friday, August 13, 2021, 4:00 PM, Courtroom 6B, Hugo L. Black U.S. Courthouse, 1729 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Defendant Eddie Watts is to be present at the hearing, as well as counsel for all parties. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/6/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Eddie Watts (pro se).(KEK) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/5/21. (SAC) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Eddie Watts.(Garner, Gwendolyn) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Alabama Department of Corrections' #9 motion for an extension of time to file a responsive pleading until on or before September 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/4/2021. (RLW) Modified on 8/10/2021 (KEK). (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint by Alabama Department of Corrections. (McCarthy, Thomas) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Michael McCarthy on behalf of Alabama Department of Corrections (McCarthy, Thomas) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Takira Taylor. Alabama Department of Corrections served on 7/19/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Takira Taylor. Eddie Watts served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Alabama Department of Corrections, Eddie Watts. Sent via certified mail. (KEK) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants, filed by Takira Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D - 2nd EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit E - 2nd RTS)(Edwards, Nicole) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3873264. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Eddie Watts, William Donaldson Correctional Facility, filed by Takira Taylor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibti B, # 3 Exhibit C)(KEK). (Edwards, Nicole) NDAL rec# B4601114304 Modified on 6/30/2021 (KAM). (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Plaintiff's failure to pay the filing fee. On or before July 6, 2021, Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff does not comply with this order, the court may dismiss this case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/29/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Takira Taylor. (KEK) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Eddie Watts, William Donaldson Correctional Facility, filed by Takira Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibti B, #3 Exhibit C)(KEK) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alabama Department of Corrections is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS M. MCCARTHY(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bart Gregory Harmon