This case was last updated from PACER on 03/14/2020 at 08:20:51 (UTC).

TAYLOR v. WARD et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 TAYLOR filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against WARD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are CLAY D LAND and STEPHEN HYLES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00007

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY D LAND

Referral Judge

STEPHEN HYLES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR, II

Columbus, GA 31907-3109

Defendants

Head Warden BRIAN CHAMBERS

Head Warden REAGAN BLACK

Commissioner TIMOTHY C WARD

ALFRED ROBERT HUNTER

ARIC REBAR

BURSE WILLIAM

Lieutenamt JULIE THORNTON

CONNIE MOODY

LETITIA BURK

JAMES HERRON

THOMAS COBBS

KEY LATOYA

AUDREY SHARPE

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 2-18-20. (jdl) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#11

(#11) BRIEF filed by CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR II (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Envelope did not bear the return address of the plaintiff, but the address of another inmate by the name of Andrew Kenyatta Brown (tlf). (Entered: 03/12/2020)

2 #1

Trust Account Statement

#3

(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR II against REAGAN BLACK, BRIAN CHAMBERS, and TIMOTHY C. WARD (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to Court Order filed by CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR, II re #5 Order, Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(esl) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#8

(#8) Marked copy of #5 Order filed by CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR II construed as response to Court Order (tlf). (Entered: 02/24/2020)

10 #1

Envelope

1 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR II (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement). Motion referred to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES (tlf). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#7

(#7) RECAST #1 Complaint against All Defendants by CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR II (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlf). (Entered: 02/24/2020)

7 #1

Envelope

#4

(#4) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR II (tlf). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of filing by CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR II (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlf). (Entered: 03/09/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) BRIEF filed by CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR II (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Envelope did not bear the return address of the plaintiff, but the address of another inmate by the name of Andrew Kenyatta Brown (tlf). (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of filing by CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR II (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlf). (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE to Court Order filed by CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR, II re #5 Order, Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(esl) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Marked copy of #5 Order filed by CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR II construed as response to Court Order (tlf). (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RECAST #1 Complaint against All Defendants by CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR II (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlf). (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 2-18-20. (jdl) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is Ordered to pay an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $12.00. ORDER to Recast Complaint within twenty-one (21) days. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 1-15-20. (rcg) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR II (tlf). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR II (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement). Motion referred to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES (tlf). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR II against REAGAN BLACK, BRIAN CHAMBERS, and TIMOTHY C. WARD (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.