This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/09/2019 at 07:19:09 (UTC).

Taylor v. Vanguard National Trailer Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/10/2019 Taylor filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Vanguard National Trailer Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harold L. Murphy and Walter E. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00092

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harold L. Murphy

Referral Judge

Walter E. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juanita Taylor

Defendant

Vanguard National Trailer Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Robert McCown

Attorney at Warren & Griffin, P.C.

Suite 108, 300 West Emery St.

Dalton, GA 30720

Randolph Scott Jackson, Jr.

Attorney at R. Scott Jackson, Jr., Attorney at Law

Suite 200, 4525 Harding Road

Nashville, TN 37205

Defendant Attorneys

Jarrett Michael Dean Spence

Attorney at Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, LLP-ATL

230 Peachtree Street, N.W., Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30303-1557

Jennifer A. Rulon

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd, LLC-OH

9277 Centre Pointe Drive

West Chester, OH 45069

Heather L. Wilson

Attorney at Frost, Brown, Todd, LLC

P.O. Box 44961, Suite 1900, 201 North Illinois Street

Indianapolis, IN 46244

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Clerks Notation re #12 Certificate of Interested Persons approved by Judge Harold L Murphy on 6/27/2019. (dob) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#12

(#12) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vanguard National Trailer Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CIMC USA Inc., Corporate Parent China International Marine Containers Group for Vanguard National Trailer Corporation. (Spence, Jarrett) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#11

(#11) Defendant Vanguard National Trailer Corporation's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Vanguard National Trailer Corporation. Discovery ends on 11/25/2019.(Spence, Jarrett) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

6 #1

Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Extension of Time

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief In Support by Vanguard National Trailer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Extension of Time)(Spence, Jarrett) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jarrett Michael Dean Spence on behalf of Vanguard National Trailer Corporation (Spence, Jarrett) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#4

(#4) Return of Service Executed by Juanita Taylor. Vanguard National Trailer Corporation served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Invoice for Service)(McCown, John) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 5/13/2019. (dob) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Vanguard National Trailer Corporation. (dob) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Juanita Taylor. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC8653855) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/10/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Clerks Notation re #12 Certificate of Interested Persons approved by Judge Harold L Murphy on 6/27/2019. (dob) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vanguard National Trailer Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CIMC USA Inc., Corporate Parent China International Marine Containers Group for Vanguard National Trailer Corporation. (Spence, Jarrett) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Defendant Vanguard National Trailer Corporation's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Vanguard National Trailer Corporation. Discovery ends on 11/25/2019.(Spence, Jarrett) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Heather L. Wilson. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 6/25/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dob) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Jennifer A. Rulon. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 6/25/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dob) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Jennifer A. Rulon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8740243). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Jennifer A. Rulon added appearing on behalf of Vanguard National Trailer Corporation (pmb) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Heather L. Wilson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8740151). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Heather L. Wilson added appearing on behalf of Vanguard National Trailer Corporation (pmb) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPLICATION for Admission of Jennifer A. Rulon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8740243). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Vanguard National Trailer Corporation. (Spence, Jarrett) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPLICATION for Admission of Heather L. Wilson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8740151). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Vanguard National Trailer Corporation. (Spence, Jarrett) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORAL ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Vanguard National Trailer Corporation Answer due 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 6/12/19. (klb) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief In Support by Vanguard National Trailer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Extension of Time)(Spence, Jarrett) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jarrett Michael Dean Spence on behalf of Vanguard National Trailer Corporation (Spence, Jarrett) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Return of Service Executed by Juanita Taylor. Vanguard National Trailer Corporation served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Invoice for Service)(McCown, John) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 5/13/2019. (dob) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Vanguard National Trailer Corporation. (dob) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Juanita Taylor. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC8653855) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vanguard National Trailer Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer A Rulon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heather L. Wilson